Amegy Bank National Association v. DB Private Wealth Mortgage, Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: Amegy Bank National Association
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown and DB Private Wealth Mortgage, Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2012cv00243
Filed: May 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting 204 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Approval of Supersedeas Bond for Purposes of Stay of Execution Pending Appeal and Supporting Memorandum of Law. The Supersedeas Bond [204-1] is approved. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/2/2014. (LMF)
May 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER denying 186 Amegy Bank's Motion to Recover Attorney's Fees and Related Nontaxable Expenses from Deutsche Bank.Alex Brown. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/27/2014. (LMF)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying 193 Defendant Alex.Brown's Rule 50(b) Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, Alternatively, Rule 59 Motion for a New Trial. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/9/2014. (LMF)
May 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER denying 191 Motion of Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown to Confirm 12 U.S.C. § 91 Stay, or, alternatively, to Grant Stay without Bond, and to Grant Temporary Stay without Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Supporting Motion.Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown shall post bond in the amount of $18,589,792.56. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/6/2014. (LMF)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/24/2014. (LMF)
March 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 JUDGMENT in favor of Amegy Bank National Association against Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/18/2014. (LMF)
March 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re 149 Objection. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE Plaintiff's letter. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/5/2014. (LMF)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER. In light of the summary judgment being issued in this matter, the Parties are directed to meet and confer telephonically and thereafter file updated joint proposed jury instructions, joint purposed verdict form, and joint pretrial statement no later than Thursday, March 6, 2014. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/3/2014. (LMF)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 107 Deutsche Bank's Motion In Limine to exclude an e-mail received by William B. Johnson. Deutsche Bank's Motion In Limine to exclude e-mail from Doug McDonald to Pam Martin and the Purported Letter Agreement Attached 108 is DENIED. Deutsche Bank's Motion In Limine to uphold Hearsay Objection and Exclude Amegy's E-mail Chain from February 25, 2011 115 is DENIED.Deutsche Bank's Motion In Limine to exclude any Mention that Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown Brok ers including William Rhodes Violated FINRA Rule 3270 116 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motion to exclude any reference that Rhodes violated FINRA 3270 is GRANTED. The motion to exclude testimony or evidence that Rhodes was paid a comm ission for initiating or participating in the loan to Johnson is DENIED. Deutsche Bank's Motion In Limine to exclude any Mention that the Host Stock Certificate was Stolen and that Defendants Had or Should have had Knowledge of the Theft 117 is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/24/2014. (LMF)
February 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting Oral Motion to Bring Electronics into Courtroom. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/21/2014. (LMF)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting 91 Defendants' Motion Requesting Judicial Notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/23/2014. (LMF)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 67 Agreed Motion to Seal. The Clerk is directed to file Exhibit "OO" under seal. The exhibit will be maintained under seal until the conclusion of this case. On or before that date, counsel may request that the documents be returned or destroyed. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/17/2013. (LMF)
October 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER denying without prejudice 53 Plaintiff Amegy Bank National Association's Motion Requesting the Court to Take Judicial Notice of Texas Law. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/9/2013. (LMF)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER REFERRING case to the Honorable Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier to conduct a settlement conference and to enter any related Orders as deemed appropriate. The parties shall contact Judge Frazier after the dispositive motions have been filed to obtain a date for a settlement conference convenient with his schedule. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/23/2013. (LMF)
January 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 31 Motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 1/9/2013. (VMF)
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 19 Motion to dismiss. Plaintiff will have 14 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint. Failure to do so may result in dismissal without further notice signed by Judge Roy B. Dalton, Jr. on 9/27/2012. (AKJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amegy Bank National Association v. DB Private Wealth Mortgage, Ltd., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Alex.Brown
Represented By: Joanne M. O'Connor
Represented By: Allen R. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Private Wealth Mortgage, Ltd.
Represented By: Joanne M. O'Connor
Represented By: Allen R. Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amegy Bank National Association
Represented By: Hunter Wyman Carroll
Represented By: Geoff Bracken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?