Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. v. Lennar Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., Neil F. Luria and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Defendant: Jennifer White, Paul Andrew Gulbronson, Michael Riley Moore, Sr., Andrew James Sorensen, David Sawyer, U.S. Home Corporation, Lennar Corporation, Julie White, Ayla D. Burnett, Jenifer Cherrington, North American Title Company, Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., Charles M. Burnett, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Matthew Devereaux, Peggy Ferguson, Aspen Home Loans, LLC, Kelly Hatch and Utah Exchange Group
Petitioner: Berger Singerman LLP
Case Number: 2:2012cv00595
Filed: October 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 1819
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2016 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender - attempted not known re: #203 Judgment, #202 Order on motion to dismiss. Mail not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (drn)
July 7, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender - unable to forward re: #203 Judgment, #202 Order on motion to dismiss. Mail not resent to Kelly Hatch. (drn)
July 6, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forwared re: #203 Judgment, #202 Order on motion to dismiss. Mail not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (drn)
July 1, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - attempted not known - unable to forward re: #203 Judgment, #202 Order on motion to dismiss. Mail not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (drn)
June 23, 2015 Filing 203 JUDGMENT (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (drn)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER granting #201 the Plaintiff, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as receiver for Colonial Bank and Taylor Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust's Unopposed Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly, terminate all pending motions and deadlines and close the case. The Court will maintain jurisdiction over the case until July 22, 2015, to enforce the terms of the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/22/2015. (LMF)
June 19, 2015 Filing 201 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Matter by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Villalba, Orlando)
May 26, 2015 Filing 200 STATUS report by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Villalba, Orlando)
March 30, 2015 Filing 199 STATUS report by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Villalba, Orlando)
February 2, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - unable to forward - not deliverable as addressed re: #197 Order administratively closing case, 198 Notice canceling hearing. Mail not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (drn)
February 2, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - unable to forward - not deliverable as addressed re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (drn)
February 2, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender - unable to forward -moved left no address re: #197 Order administratively closing case, 198 Notice canceling hearing. Mail not resent to Julie White. (drn)
January 28, 2015 Filing 198 NOTICE canceling Final Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 1/30/2015 and Jury Trial scheduled for the March 2015 trial term. (LMF)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 197 ORDER directing administrative closure. The Clerk is directed to terminate any previously scheduled deadlines, and pending motions, and administratively close the case pending further Order. The Plaintiff FDIC shall file a written notice every sixty (60) days informing the Court of the status of the settlement agreement. The Case is hereby REMOVED from the March 2015 trial calendar, and the final pretrial conference scheduled for January 30, 2015 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/28/2015. (LMF)
January 27, 2015 Filing 196 NOTICE of settlement by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Villalba, Orlando)
January 26, 2015 Filing 195 Witness List by Michael Riley Moore, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 26, 2015 Filing 194 Exhibit List by Michael Riley Moore, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 23, 2015 Filing 193 MOTIONS to extend pretrial deadlines and trial continuance or dismiss her as a defendant by Ayla D. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 23, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail resent to Jennifer White (2708 Glasshouse Road Jamestown, NC 27282). (drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 192 Witness List by Ayla D. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 191 Witness List by Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 190 Witness List by Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 189 Witness List by Charles M. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 188 Exhibit List by Charles M. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 187 Exhibit List by Ayla D. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 186 Exhibit List by Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 185 Witness List by Jennifer White. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Filing 184 Exhibit List by Jennifer White. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(drn)
January 20, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - attempted not known - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Utah Exchange Group. (drn)
January 20, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - vacant - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (drn)
January 20, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - attempted not known - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (drn)
January 20, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - vacant - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Charles M. Burnett. (drn)
January 8, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - moved left no address - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Julie White. (drn)
January 8, 2015 Mail returned as Undeliverable - moved left no address - unable to forward re: #183 Order on Motion to Continue Order on motion to extend time. Mail not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (drn)
January 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART #181 Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer's Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and for Trial Continuance. The mediation deadline is extended to January 29, 2015. The motion is otherwise denied and all other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 1/5/2015. (BLW)
December 29, 2014 Filing 182 RESPONSE in Opposition re #181 MOTION to Continue Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines and for Trial Continuance filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Villalba, Orlando)
December 23, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender (does not live at address), not deliverable as addressed, unable to forward re: #180 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
December 11, 2014 Filing 181 MOTION to Continue Trial by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Strasius, Anthony). Added MOTION to extend time to Extend Pretrial Deadlines on 12/30/2014 (SLU).
November 17, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable - not deliverable as addressed - unable to forward re: #180 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail not resent to Jennifer White. (drn)
November 10, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #180 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail was not resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (SPB)
November 10, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #180 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC C/o Kelly Hatch. (SPB)
October 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting #179 the Plaintiffs, Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee of the Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation, and the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, and the Defendants, Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, North American Title Company, Matthew Devereaux and Andrew James Sorensen's (Settlement Defendants) Joint Motion to Relieve the Settling Defendants From All Remaining Pretrial Deadlines. The deadlines outlined in the Case Management and Scheduling Order shall be stayed as to the Settlement Defendants ONLY. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/30/2014. (LMF)
October 27, 2014 Filing 179 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Relieve the Settling Defendants From All Remaining Pre-Trial Deadlines and Incorporated Memorandum of Law / Notice of Settlement by Matthew Devereaux, Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, Andrew James Sorensen, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
September 23, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable - return to sender - unable to forward re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (drn)
August 25, 2014 Mail returned asreturn to sender/not deliverable.unable to forward re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
August 22, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
August 21, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/insufficient address/Unable to forward re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
August 18, 2014 Mail returned as attempted not known re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Paul A. Gulbronson. (RMT)
August 18, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
August 14, 2014 Mail returned as forward timx exp., return to sender Undeliverable re: #178 Order on Motion to Continue. Mail was not resent to Kelly Hatch and Aspen Home Loan, LLC. (RMT)
August 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER denying #177 The Plaintiffs Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee of the Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and the FDIC as Receiver of Colonial Bank and the Defendants, Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, North American Title Company, Matthew Devereaux and Andrew James Sorenson's Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Reset Certain Pre-Trial Dates. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/11/2014. (LMF)
August 7, 2014 Filing 177 Joint MOTION to Continue Trial and Reset Certain Pre-Trial Dates and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Neil F. Luria. (Gassenheimer, James)
February 24, 2014 Filing 176 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Jennifer White. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 24, 2014 Filing 175 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Julie White. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 24, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 165 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
February 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying #167 Defendant Ayla Burnett's Motion to Allow All Pro Se Defendants to Have Access to the Electronic Filing System or to Email Filings to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/21/2014. (BLW)
February 21, 2014 Filing 173 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #22 Amended Complaint by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc..(Kelman, Rachel)
February 21, 2014 Filing 172 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Peggy Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 20, 2014 Filing 171 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Utah Exchange Group. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 20, 2014 Filing 170 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Ayla D. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 20, 2014 Filing 169 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Charles M. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 20, 2014 Filing 168 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Julie White. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 20, 2014 Filing 167 MOTION for electronic filing by Ayla D. Burnett. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(RMT)
February 18, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 165 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
February 14, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable @ 1486 Raptor Rd. Eagle Mountain, UT 84005 re: 158 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (SLU)
February 11, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 158 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Mail was not resent to Charles M. Burnett, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Ayala D. Burnett and Utah Exchange Group. (RMT)
February 10, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as adressed/unable to forward re: 158 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White and Julie White. (RMT)
February 6, 2014 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: 165 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
February 4, 2014 Filing 166 AMENDED ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
February 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ENDORSED ORDER granting #163 Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal Inc. and David Sawyer's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal Inc. and David Sawyer shall have up to and including February 21, 2014, to respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 2/3/2014. (BLW)
January 31, 2014 Filing 164 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #22 Amended Complaint by Matthew Devereaux.(Mazzara, Justin)
January 31, 2014 Filing 163 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Amended Complaint by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelman, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
January 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER granting #159 The Plaintiffs and Defendants' Joint Motion to Continue Trial and Reset Pre-Trial Dates. SEE ORDER FOR AMENDED DEADLINES. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/31/2014. (LMF)
January 31, 2014 Filing 161 ANSWER to #22 Amended Complaint by Andrew James Sorensen.(Wallace, David)
January 31, 2014 Filing 160 Defendants Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #22 Amended Complaint by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation.(Bass, Hilarie)
January 31, 2014 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Discovery due by 10/3/2014, Dispositive motions due by 10/28/2014, Pretrial statement due by 1/19/2015, All other motions due by 1/19/2015, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2015 at 09:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 3/2/2015 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell., Conduct mediation hearing by 7/21/2014. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 9/4/2014, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 8/4/2014.(LMF)
January 30, 2014 Mail returned as Undeliverable (moved left no address unable to forward) re: 158 Case Assigned/Reassigned. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (SLU)
January 29, 2014 Filing 159 JOINT MOTION to Continue Trial and Reset Pre-Trial Dates and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Matthew Devereaux, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Peggy Ferguson, Paul Andrew Gulbronson, Lennar Corporation, Neil F. Luria, Michael Riley Moore, Sr, North American Title Company, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, David Sawyer, Andrew James Sorensen, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., U.S. Home Corporation, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (O'Keefe, Kelly) Modified on 1/29/2014 to edit event and docket text (SLU).
January 27, 2014 Filing 158 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando pursuant to 2:14-mc-1-FtM-29. New case number: 2:12-cv-595-FtM-38CM. Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (kma)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER denying #67 the Defendants, Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/17/2014. (LMF)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying #111 Defendants, Ayla D Burnett, Charles M Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jenifer White, Julie White, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/17/2014. (LMF)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER denying #58 the Defendant, Matthew Devereaux's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/17/2014. (LMF)
January 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER denying #60 the Defendants Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 1/17/2014. (LMF)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw and Request for Removal from Electronic Notifications. Movants are permitted to withdraw as counsel for non-party Berger Singerman LLP and the Clerk is directed to remove Movants from receiving any further electronic notification in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 1/8/2014. (CAS)
December 30, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #151Case management and scheduling order. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 23, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender, Undeliverable as addressed re: #151 Case management and scheduling order. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 20, 2013 Filing 152 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw and Request for Removal From Electronic Notifications by Berger Singerman LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable, unknown at this address re: #150 Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail was not resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (RMT)
December 12, 2013 Mail returned as moved left no address/Unable to forward/return to sender re: #151Case management and scheduling order. Mail was not resent to Paul A. Gulbronson. (RMT)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 7/18/2014, All other motions due by 7/18/2014, Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2014 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Jury Trial set for trial term beginning 9/2/2014 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/9/2013. (LMF)
December 6, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender re: #150 Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail was not resent to Charles Burnett. (RMT)
December 5, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #150Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail was not resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (RMT)
November 22, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable -unable to forward - return to sender re: #150 Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail not resent to Jennifer White. (drn)
November 22, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable - unknown at this address (8189 Fort Hill Road, Eagle Mountain, UT) re: #150 Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail not resent to Utah Exchange Group. (drn)
November 13, 2013 Mail returned as moved left no address/Unable to forward/return to sender re: #150 Order on Motion to Disqualify. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
November 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER denying #18 the Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2013. (LMF)
October 24, 2013 Filing 149 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Berger Singerman LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shanstrom, Victoria)
October 11, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward/no whites live her re: 148 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
September 30, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 148 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (SLU)
September 17, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: 148 Notice to counsel of filing of official transcript. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
September 12, 2013 Filing 148 NOTICE to counsel of filing of OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the court reporter or view the document at the clerk's office public terminal. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (JS)
September 12, 2013 Filing 147 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on August 28, 2013, before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Court Reporter/Transcriber R. Joy Stancel,Telephone number 239/461-2064. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or purchased through the Court Reporter.. Redaction Request due 10/3/2013, Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/15/2013, Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/11/2013. (JS)
August 28, 2013 Filing 146 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell: MOTION HEARING held on 8/28/2013 re #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. Counsel: Richard Critchlow, Esq., Elizabeth Honkonen, Esq., and Victoria Shanstrom, Esq., for Berger Singerman LLP; Hilarie Bass, Esq., and Timothy Kolaya, Esq., for Lennar Corporation. Counsel for the parties presented arguments with respect to the motion - the matter will be taken under advisement by the Court. Court Reporter: R. Joy Stancel (1:30pm-3:18pm) (DH)
August 19, 2013 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/ Unable to forward re: #145 Order on Motion to Substitute Party. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
August 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting #135 Renewed Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The Clerk is directed to substitute Neil F. Luria, as Plan Trustee, in place of Plaintiff Taylor, Bean & Whitaker in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 8/14/2013. (CAS)
August 14, 2013 Filing 144 NOTICE of supplemental authority by Berger Singerman LLP (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Case: Galderma Labs., L.P. v. Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC)(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
August 9, 2013 Mail returned as Return to sender/Moved left no address/Unable to forward re: #142 Order on Motion to Continue, 143 Notice of rescheduling hearing. Mail as not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
August 5, 2013 Filing 143 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion to Disqualify Counsel Hearing previously scheduled for 08/20/13 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Motion Hearing set for 8/28/2013 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LAF)
August 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER granting #139 Motion to Continue. The Hearing on the Motion to Disqualify Counsel for the Plaintiff, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation will be held on Wednesday, August 28, 2013, at 1:30pm before the undersigned at the United States Courthouse and Federal Building, Courtroom 5D, 2110 First Street, Fort Myers, FL 33901. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/5/2013. (LAF)
August 1, 2013 Filing 141 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. of filing Paul Andrew Gulbronson's Answer to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint (O'Keefe, Kelly)
August 1, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE of adoption by Matthew Devereaux re #138 Response to motion (Mazzara, Justin)
August 1, 2013 Filing 139 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing 137 on Lennar Defendants' Motion to Disqualify #18 and Stipulation Regarding Presentation of Live Testimony at Hearing on Motion to Disqualify by Berger Singerman LLP, Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Setting Aug. 20 Hearing in Batchelor Case, #2 Exhibit B - Order Granting Motion for Continuance in Batchelor Case, #3 Exhibit C - Order Setting Trial in Fried Case, #4 Exhibit D - Amended Scheduling Order in Treo Case)(Kolaya, Timothy)
July 29, 2013 Mail returned as moved left no address/unable to forward/return to sender re: 137Notice of hearing on motion. Mail was not resent to Paul Gulbronson. (RMT)
July 24, 2013 Filing 138 RESPONSE to Motion re #135 Second MOTION to Substitute Party Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
July 24, 2013 Filing 137 NOTICE of hearing on motion #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2013 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. (LMF)
July 24, 2013 Mail returned as moved left no address, Unable to forward, return to sender re: 134Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (RMT)
July 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting #132 Agreed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants and Continuance of Deadlines. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/22/2013. (CAS)
July 10, 2013 Filing 135 Second MOTION to Substitute Party Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
July 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ENDORSED ORDER granting #133 Agreed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. Paul Andrew Gulbronson shall have until 7/22/2013 in which to file a response to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/8/2013. (brh)
July 2, 2013 Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Paul Gulbronson by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
July 1, 2013 Filing 132 Unopposed MOTION for Norton, Hammersley, Lopez & Skokos to withdraw as attorney of record for Defendants by Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (Inverso, Darren) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as plaintiff in this proceeding in place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/20/2013. (CAS) Modified on 6/24/2013 to correct docket entry(kma).
June 14, 2013 Filing 130 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Plaintiffs' Request for Status Conference by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
June 14, 2013 Filing 129 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. of Filing Return of Service on Paul Andrew Gulbronson (O'Keefe, Kelly)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ENDORSED ORDER granting #122 Motion for Extension of time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. The Defendants, Ayla d. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jenifer White, Julie White, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC shall have until June 30, 2013 in which to file their Initial Disclosures. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/14/2013. (brh)
June 14, 2013 Set/reset scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2013, Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2013, Discovery due by 4/4/2014, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2014, Pretrial statement due by 8/4/2014, All other motions due by 8/4/2014, Conduct mediation hearing by 4/8/2014. Lead counsel to coordinate dates., Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2014, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2014 (kma)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Jury Trial set for trial term commencing 9/2/2014 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/6/2013. (LMF)
June 5, 2013 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re #122 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Initial Disclosures filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
June 3, 2013 Filing 125 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Aspen Home Loans, LLC (RMT)
June 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER. The Clerk of the Court shall enter a Clerks Default against the Defendant Aspen Home Loans, LLC for failure to appear and for failure to obtain counsel or respond in any manner to the Court's Order to Show Cause. The Court will take no further action on its Order to Show Cause (Doc. #110). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/3/2013. (LMF)
May 31, 2013 Filing 123 NOTICE of compliance re 118 Order on motion to extend time served Mandatory Initial Disclosures on May 30, 2013 by Matthew Devereaux (Mazzara, Justin)
May 31, 2013 Filing 122 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Ayla D. Burnett. (Inverso, Darren)
May 30, 2013 Filing 121 Case reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell pursuant to 2:13-mc-19-FtM-29 and Unassigned Magistrate pursuant to 2:13-mc-20-FtM-29. New case number: 2:12-cv-595-FtM-38UAM. Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case in the presider role and Judge Sheri Polster Chappell no longer assigned to the case in the magistrate role. (kma)
May 30, 2013 Filing 120 NOTICE by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer of filing Initial Disclosures (Kelman, Rachel)
May 17, 2013 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re #111 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint [RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANTS AYLA D. BURNETT, CHARLES M. BURNETT, PEGGY FERGUSON, JENIFER WHITE, JULIE WHITE, UTAH EXCHANGE GROUP, AND RIVERWALK PROPERTY VENTURES] filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ENDORSED ORDER granting #117 the Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures. For good cause shown and because the Motion is unopposed, the Parties shall have up to and including May 30, 2013, to serve their respective mandatory initial disclosures. All other deadlines remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/1/2013. (BLW)
April 29, 2013 Filing 117 Joint MOTION to extend time to Serve Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., Matthew Devereaux, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, David Sawyer, Andrew James Sorensen, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., U.S. Home Corporation. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
April 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ENDORSED ORDER granting #115 Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Order Extending Return Date for Response to the Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint of Defendants Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jennifer White, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures LLC. Plaintiffs Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation have until and including May 17, 2013, to respond to the motion. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/29/2013. (CH)
April 26, 2013 Filing 115 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #111 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
April 23, 2013 Filing 114 RESPONSE re #112 Notice (Other) filed by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
April 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 6/28/2013, Joinder of Parties due by 6/28/2013, Discovery due by 4/4/2014, Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2014, Pretrial statement due by 8/4/2014, All other motions due by 8/4/2014, Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/3/2014, Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/3/2014, Jury Trial set for term commencing 9/2/2014 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Judge Unassigned Judge., Conduct mediation hearing by 4/18/2014. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/22/2013. (LAF)
April 22, 2013 Filing 112 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #95 Reply to Response to Motion, #60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #85 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(O'Keefe, Kelly)
April 15, 2013 Filing 111 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (Inverso, Darren)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER to show cause as to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. Defendant Aspen Home Loans, LLC is directed to SHOW CAUSE on or before April 5, 2013, why it has failed to obtain counsel or counsel shall file a notice of appearance on its behalf by this date. Failure to respond and obtain counsel will result in default judgment being entered against Defendant Aspen Home Loans, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/26/2013. (LMF)
March 25, 2013 Filing 109 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ENDORSED ORDER granting #107 Amended Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Allow Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Verifying Plaintiff's Agreement to Thirty Day Extension. Defendants Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jenifer White, Julie White, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC have until and including April 17, 2013, to respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. The Court accordingly denies as moot #106 Defendants' duplicative motion for extension. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/19/2013. (CH)
March 18, 2013 Filing 107 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint Verifying Plaintiff's Agreement to Thirty Day Extension by Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (Inverso, Darren)
March 18, 2013 Filing 106 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reponse to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (Inverso, Darren)
March 15, 2013 Filing 105 NOTICE of Appearance by Darren Robert Inverso on behalf of Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White (Inverso, Darren)
March 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. The Court will take no further action regarding the Order to Comply. Counsel J. David Dantzler, Jr., and Thomas B. Bosch have been terminated and shall be removed from CM/ECF notifications. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/13/2013. (LMF)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER for J. David Danztler, Jr., and Thomas B. Bosch to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/27/2013. (LMF)
February 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ENDORSED ORDER granting #101 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Paul Andrew Gulbronson with Process. Plaintiffs have until and including August 26, 2013, to effect service of process on Defendant Gulbronson. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/27/2013. (CH)
February 26, 2013 Filing 101 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Serve Defendant Paul Andrew Gulbronson with Process by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Non-Service of Process)(O'Keefe, Kelly)
February 22, 2013 Filing 100 NOTICE by Matthew Devereaux re #95 Reply to Response to Motion (Fularczyk, Kevin)
February 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #97 Case Management Report. The Parties' Case Management Report #97 is STRICKEN. The Clerk of Court is directed to note on the docket that this entry is stricken. The Parties are directed to file a revised case management report on or before March 25, 2013. The Parties may conduct any case management conferences telephonically. A notice of appearance must be filed on behalf of the pro se Defendants by March 18, 2013. If no notice of appearance is filed, the Court will assume they are proceeding pro se. The corporate Defendants MUST obtain counsel. Failure to do so could result in default judgment being entered against it. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/19/2013. (LMF)
February 18, 2013 Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Kelman, Rachel)
February 13, 2013 Filing 97 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT.(O'Keefe, Kelly)STRICKEN PURSUANT TO DOC #99 Modified on 2/20/2013 (RMT).
February 8, 2013 Filing 96 NOTICE by Berger Singerman LLP re #91 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Sur-Reply Regarding Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff (Doc. #18) Notice of Filing Supplemental Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
February 7, 2013 Filing 95 REPLY to Response to Motion re #60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
February 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ENDORSED ORDER granting #93 Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Defendants may file a reply, not to exceed 15 pages, on or before February 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/6/2013. (CH)
February 5, 2013 Filing 93 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Strasius, Anthony)
January 30, 2013 Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint of Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer filed by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
January 29, 2013 Filing 91 SUR-REPLY Regarding Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff (Doc. #18) by Berger Singerman LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Supp. Berger Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Supp. Carriuolo Decl. (Part One of Two), #3 Exhibit 2 - Supp. Carriuolo Decl. (Part Two of Two), #4 Exhibit 3 - Singerman Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Pera Suppl. Rpt., #6 Exhibit 5 - Hearing Transcript, #7 Exhibit 6 - Petition to Amend)(Honkonen, Elizabeth) Per Law Clerk DDK Modified on 6/17/2013 (RMT).
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 56 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Mail resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 56 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Mail resent to Charles M. Burnett. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 56 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Mail resent to Utah Exchange Group. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail resent to Utah Exchange Group. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 56 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Mail resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail resent to Charles M. Burnett. (SLU)
January 23, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (SLU)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ENDORSED ORDER granting #89 Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. The reply, not to exceed 15 pages, must be filed on or before February 7, 2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/22/2013. (CH)
January 22, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (SLU)
January 22, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 56 Order on Motion for Leave to File. Mail resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (SLU)
January 22, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 62. Mail resent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson. (SLU)
January 18, 2013 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply to #85 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to #60 Motion to Dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
January 17, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Utah Exchange Group, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC., Charles M. Burnett & Ayla D. Burnett. (RMT)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ENDORSED ORDER granting #87 Berger Singerman LLP's Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition to Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. The sur-reply, not to exceed 12 pages, may be filed on or before January 29, 2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/16/2013. (CH)
January 16, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #41 Order. Mail was resent to Utah Exchange Group, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC., Charles M. Burnett & Ayla D. Burnett. (RMT)
January 16, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2,#37Interested persons order. Mail was resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
January 15, 2013 Filing 87 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff by Berger Singerman LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
January 14, 2013 Filing 86 RESPONSE in opposition re #58 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint [Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendant Matthew Devereaux's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint] filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
January 14, 2013 Filing 85 RESPONSE in opposition re #60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint] filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss in FDIC, as Receiver for Indymac Bank v. Genesis Title Co., US S.D. Fla. Case No. 11-20841-CIV-ALTONAGA/Simonton, #2 Exhibit B - Order Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definitive Statement in FDIC, as Receiver for BankUnited v. Kunzmann Appraisals, Inc., et al., U.S. S.D. Fla. Case No.: 12-CV-80525-RYSKAMP/HOPKINS)(O'Keefe, Kelly)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ENDORSED ORDER granting #82 Plaintiffs Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corporation and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a 26-page Response to Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. The response may not exceed 26 pages. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/11/2013. (CH)
January 10, 2013 Filing 83 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Ann O'Keefe on behalf of Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. (O'Keefe, Kelly)
January 10, 2013 Filing 82 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages [Plaintiffs, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.'s and Federal Deposition Insurance Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a 26-Page Response to Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint] by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Gassenheimer, James)
January 4, 2013 Filing 81 REQUEST for oral argument re #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Foslid, Adam)
January 4, 2013 Filing 80 REPLY to response to motion re #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Report of Lawrence J. Fox, #2 Exhibit 2 - Second Declaration of Marcie R. Getelman)(Foslid, Adam)
January 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ENDORSED ORDER granting #78 Agreed Motion of Plaintiffs and Defendants Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Julie White, Jennifer White, Utah Exchange Group and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint. These named Defendants have until and including February 18, 2013, to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/4/2013. (CH)
January 3, 2013 Filing 78 MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re #22 Amended complaint [AGREED Motion of Plaintiffs and Defendants Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Julie White, Jenifer White, Utah Exchange Group and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint] by Aspen Home Loans, LLC, Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Peggy Ferguson, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., Utah Exchange Group, Jennifer White, Julie White. (Kegerreis, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 64 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as returnh to sender/not deliverable/unable to forward re: 64 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 66 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/replyOrder on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 64 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was resent to Michael Riley Moore Sr.. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 66 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/replyOrder on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Utah Exchange Group. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 66 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/replyOrder on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Ayla D. Burnett. (RMT)
January 3, 2013 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 66 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/replyOrder on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Charles M. Burnett. (RMT)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ENDORSED ORDER granting #75 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Permit Case Management Meeting of Parties by Telephone. The parties may conduct the case management meeting telephonically. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 1/2/2013. (CH)
December 31, 2012 Filing 76 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 [Plaintiffs' Certificate of Service of Related Case Order and Track Two Notice] (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 31, 2012 Filing 75 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically PERMIT CASE MANAGEMENT MEETING OF PARTIES BY TELEPHONE [Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Permit Case Management Meeting of Parties by Telephone] by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ENDORSED ORDER granting #73 Edward J. Peterson's Consent Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Plaintiff Taylor Bean is now represented by other counsel and consents to the withdraw of attorney Edward J. Peterson. Thus, the motion to withdraw is due to be granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Mr. Peterson as counsel of record for Plaintiff Taylor Bean and remove him from all further notices of electronic filing in this matter. Mr. Peterson is relieved of all further responsibility in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/28/2012. (BLW)
December 28, 2012 Filing 73 Consent MOTION for Edward J. Peterson to withdraw as attorney for Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Peterson, Edward) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
December 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ENDORSED ORDER granting #71 Plaintiffs Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs have until and including January 30, 2013, to respond to the motion. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/27/2012. (CH)
December 27, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address re: 64 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was resent to Julie White. (RMT)
December 27, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re:62 Order. Mail was resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
December 27, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/Undeliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 62 Order. Mail was resent to Michael Riley Moore, Sr.. (RMT)
December 27, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed re: 62 Order. Mail was resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
December 26, 2012 Filing 71 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #67 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint [Plaintiffs, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Saywer's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint] by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ENDORSED ORDER granting #69 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Counsel and Unrepresented Parties to Meet for Purposes of Preparing and Filing a Case Management Report. The parties have until and including January 30, 2013, to conduct a case management meeting. The parties must file a case management report on or before February 13, 2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/26/2012. (CH)
December 21, 2012 Mail returned as not at this address/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #41 Order. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 21, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION to extend time to Meet for Purposes of Preparing and Filing a Case Management Report Pursuant to Local Rule 3.05(B) and Related Case Order [AGREED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR COUNSEL AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES TO MEET FOR PURPOSES OF PREPARING AND FILING A CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.05(B) AND RELATED CASE ORDER by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 21, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of compliance re #41 Order, 62 Order [Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance with Court's Orders Regarding Addresses of Pro Se Defendants, Document Nos. 41 and 62] by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 20, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to dismiss the Amended Complaint by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Kelman, Rachel)
December 20, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 56 Order on motion for leave to file, 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ENDORSED ORDER granting #65 Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time and for Leave for Additional Pages on Reply to Response in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Defendants may file a reply, not to exceed 20 pages, on or before January 4, 2013. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/19/2012. (CH)
December 19, 2012 Mail returned as not at this address/return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 18, 2012 Filing 65 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #43 Response in opposition to motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Corp., Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages on reply to #43 Response in opposition to motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Corp. by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ENDORSED ORDER granting #63 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responses to: (1) Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation and North American Title Company's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; (2) Matthew Devereaux's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; and (3) Andrew James Sorensen's Notice of Joinder. Plaintiffs have until and including January 14, 2013, to respond to each of these filings. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/18/2012. (CH)
December 18, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 56 Order on motion for leave to file, 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
December 18, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/Unable to forward/moved left no address re: 62 Order. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
December 18, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted not known/Unable to forward re: 56 Order on motion for leave to file, #41 Order, 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore, Sr.. (RMT)
December 17, 2012 Filing 63 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint, #59 Notice (Other), #58 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint [PLAINTIFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSES TO (1) LENNAR CORPORATION, U.S. HOME CORPORATION, AND NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANY'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; (2) MATTHEW DEVERAUX'S MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND (3) ANDREW JAMES SORENSEN'S NOTICE OF JOINDER] by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 13, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #24 Order on motion to substitute attorney, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 13, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted not known/unable to forward re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #41 Order. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
December 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER. On November 28, 2012, the Court entered an Order directing the Parties to confer regarding the correct address(es) for each pro se Defendant, including both individuals and business. (Doc. #41). Once the addresses are compiled, the Court directed Plaintiff Taylor Bean to file a Notice with the Court which includes the addresses. A Notice has not yet been filed and the Court did not indicate in the Order a date on which the Notice must be filed. Therefore, the Court directs that the Notice with the correct addresses in compliance with Doc. #41 be filed by Plaintiff on or before December 21, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/12/2012. (BLW)
December 11, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 42Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, #41 Order. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
December 11, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/unable to forward re: 56 Order on motion for leave to file, 52 Order on Motion to Seal Document. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
December 11, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted-not known/Unable to forward re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore Sr. (RMT)
December 10, 2012 Filing 61 REQUEST for oral argument re #60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 10, 2012 Filing 60 MOTION to dismiss #22 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 10, 2012 Filing 59 NOTICE by Andrew James Sorensen re #58 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint, #22 Amended complaint of Joinder in Motion to Dismiss (Wallace, David)
December 10, 2012 Filing 58 MOTION to dismiss First Amended Complaint by Matthew Devereaux. (Tripp, Theodore)
December 6, 2012 Mail returned as not at this address/return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 6, 2012 Mail returned as not at this address/unable to forward/not deliverable as addressed re: 39 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
December 5, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W. Kehoe on behalf of Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation (Kehoe, Gregory)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting #55 Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply. The reply, not to exceed 15 pages, may be filed on or before December 20, 2012. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/5/2012. (CH)
December 5, 2012 Sealed document S-1. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Filing 55 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Reply re #43 Response by Berger Singerman to #18 Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 4, 2012 Filing 54 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Andrew James Sorensen. (Wallace, David)
December 4, 2012 Filing 53 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Berger Singerman LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ENDORSED ORDER granting Berger Singerman's Unopposed Motion to Seal Exhibits #45. Berger Singerman may file the relevant documents under seal pursuant to Local Rule 1.09. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 12/4/2012. (CH)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/no such person at this address/attempted - not known/Unable to forward re: 39 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply, #35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: #41 Order. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted not known/Unable to forward re: #35Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore Sr.. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/unable to forward re: 42 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as retunr to sneder/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 39 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted not known/Unable to forward re: #24 Order on motion to substitute attorney, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore, Sr.. (RMT)
December 4, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #24 Order on motion to substitute attorney, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Utah Exchange Group. (RMT)
December 3, 2012 Filing 51 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. Related case(s): yes (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 3, 2012 Filing 50 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #44 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement, #37 Interested persons order [PLAINTIFFS TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.'S AMENDED AND FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Neil F. Luria, as Plan Trustee of the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust for Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.; Other Affiliate Colonial Bank, N.A. for Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
December 3, 2012 Filing 49 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Defendants David Sawyer and by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc.. (Kelman, Rachel)
December 3, 2012 Filing 48 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2 per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Matthew Devereaux. Related case(s): yes (Mazzara, Justin)
December 3, 2012 Filing 47 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kolaya, Timothy)
December 3, 2012 Filing 46 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Matthew Devereaux. (Mazzara, Justin)
December 3, 2012 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION to seal document Exhibits to Declarations Filed With Its Response in Opposition to Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporations's Motion to Disqualify by Berger Singerman, LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
December 3, 2012 Filing 44 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #37 Interested persons order by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 30, 2012 Filing 43 RESPONSE in opposition re #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Berger Singerman, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Pera Decl., #2 Exhibit 2 - Berger Decl., #3 Exhibit 3 - Eng. Ltrs., #4 Exhibit 4 - Carriuolo Decl., #5 Exhibit 5 - Stip., #6 Exhibit 6 - Not. of Stip., #7 Exhibit 7 - Dkt. sheet excerpts, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice, #9 Exhibit 9 - July 2011 Order excerpts, #10 Exhibit 10 - Plan excerpts, #11 Exhibit 11 - August 2011 Motion, #12 Exhibit 12 - McKession Order, #13 Exhibit 13 - Artnett Order, #14 Exhibit 14 - Discl. Stmt. excerpts, #15 Exhibit 15 - Am. Complt. excerpts, #16 Exhibit 16 - Sorenson Ans. excerpts, #17 Exhibit 17 - Devereaux Ans. excerpts, #18 Exhibit 18 - Bujanowski Order)(Honkonen, Elizabeth)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted unknown/unable to forward re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file, 39 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore, Sr.. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/ not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as not at this address/return to sender/Unable to forward re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file. Mail was not resent to Jennifer White. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted- not known/unable to forward re: #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #37 Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Michael Riley Moore Sr.. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/ not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #37 Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned asattempted - not known re: #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #37Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
November 30, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender re: #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #37Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
November 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/29/2012. (Covington, Virginia)
November 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER. So that the pro se Defendants may participate in and be aware of the proceedings as they occur in this case, the Parties are directed to confer regarding the correct address(es) for each pro se Defendant, including both individuals and businesses. Once the addresses are compiled, Plaintiff Taylor Bean is directed to file a Notice with the Court which includes the addresses. The addresses in the Notice shall be the addresses included on all future certificates of service, unless and until an address changes. Once the Notice is filed the Clerk of Court is directed to update the pro se Defendants addresses in CM/ECF as needed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/28/2012. (LMF)
November 28, 2012 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file excess pages 30-Page Response to Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. by Berger Singerman, LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
November 28, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT)
November 27, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file, #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #37 Interested persons order #35 Order 27 Endorsed Order. Mail was resent to Charles M. Burnett. (RMT)
November 27, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverableas addressed re:32 Order on motion for leave to file, #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2,#37 Interested persons order #35 Order. Mail was not resent to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC. 27 Endorsed Order (RMT)
November 27, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file, #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2, #35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer, #37 Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Alya D. Burnett. (RMT)
November 27, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file, #36 Related case order and notice of designation of track 2,#35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice, 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer, #37Interested persons order. Mail was not resent to Utah Exchange Group. (RMT)
November 26, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: 39 Order on motion for extension of time to file response/reply, 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
November 23, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 27 Order on motion for extension of time to answer 32 Order on motion for leave to file reply. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT).
November 23, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no address/Unable to forward re: #35 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting #38 Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer have until and including December 20, 2012, to respond to the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/20/2012. (CH)
November 19, 2012 Filing 38 MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Appraisal Defs Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint)(Strasius, Anthony)
November 19, 2012 Filing 37 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/3/2012. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/19/2012. (LMF)
November 19, 2012 Filing 36 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2012. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/19/2012. (LMF)
November 19, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/moved left no adress/Unable to forward re: 32 Order on motion for leave to file. Mail was not resent to Julie White. (RMT)
November 19, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages #24 Order granting motion. Mail was not resent to Aspen Home Loans, LLC. (RMT)
November 19, 2012 Mail returned as Undeliverable as addressed re: #24 Order on motion to substitute attorney, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was not resent to Charles M. Burnett, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Ayla D. Burnett. (RMT)
November 19, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/attempted-not known/Unable to forward re: 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages #24 Order granting motion . Mail was resent to Utah Exchange Group. (RMT)
November 19, 2012 Mail returned as return to sender/not deliverable as addressed/unable to forward re: #24 Order on motion to substitute attorney, 23 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Mail was resent to Peggy Ferguson. (RMT).
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 motion to appear pro hac vice. See Order for details.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/16/2012. (LMF)
November 16, 2012 Filing 34 Amended MOTION for Michael H. Delbick and Orlando Villalba to appear pro hac vice by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Geraghty, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
November 15, 2012 Filing 33 RESPONSE re #20 Response in opposition to motion Reply to Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, and North American Title Company's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Corp. by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Geraghty, Patrick)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 the Plan Trustee's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Reply. The Plan Trustee may file a reply, not to exceed 10 pages, on or before November 23, 2012. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/15/2012. (CH)
November 14, 2012 Filing 31 MOTION for leave to file Reply to Lennar Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Geraghty, Patrick)
November 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Berger Singerman LLP's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Berger Singerman has until and including November 30, 2012, to respond. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 11/14/2012. (CH)
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice #28 Plaintiffs Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Consent to Designation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/13/2012. (LMF)
November 13, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for Michael H Delbick and Orlando Villalba to appear pro hac vice by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Geraghty, Patrick) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
November 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #26 Defendants Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation, North American Title Company, Matthew Devereaux, and Andrew James Sorensen's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. For good cause shown and because the Motion is unopposed, Defendants Lennar, U.S. Home, North American Title, Devereaux, and Sorensen shall have up to and including December 10, 2012 to respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/13/2012. (BLW)
November 12, 2012 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead re #22 Amended complaint by Matthew Devereaux, Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, Andrew James Sorensen, U.S. Home Corporation. (Foslid, Adam) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
November 9, 2012 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to file response/reply as to #18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Berger Singerman, LLP. (Honkonen, Elizabeth)
November 9, 2012 Summons issued as to Paul Andrew Gulbronson, Michael Riley Moore, Sr. (SPB)
November 7, 2012 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Michael Delbick, Orlando Villaloa (Filing fee $20 receipt number FTM3642.) (BJH)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Motion to substitute attorney. Attorneys Onier Llopiz and Joan Carlos Wizel of the law firm Lydecker Diaz are relieved of any further responsibility in this matter. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate them as counsel of record for Defendants Anthony Gizzy Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer and to remove them from all further notices of electronic filing. The Clerk of Court is directed to indicate on the docket that attorneys Anthony P. Strasius and Rachel F. Kelman of the law firm Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP, 100 SE 2nd St., Suite 3800, Miami, Florida, 33131-2126, are now counsel of record for Defendants Anthony Gizzy Real Estate Appraisal, Inc. and David Sawyer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/6/2012. (LAF)
November 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #16 Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Coropration's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. Defendants filed the Motion to Disqualify, which is 25-pages in length. (Doc. #18). This comports with Local Rule 3.01(a). Therefore, the instant Motion to exceed the page limitations is denied as moot. The Court will accept the Motion to Disqualify as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/6/2012. (BLW)
November 5, 2012 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT [FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 09/11/2006 Agreement between Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. and Aspen Home Loans dba Alpine Funding LLC, #2 Exhibit B - General Loan Closing Instructions and Agreement with North American Title Company and 03-07-2005 letter from North American Title Insurance Corp to TBW)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file the operative complaint in this matter as a separate entry in the CM/ECF system. Any motions that were pending in the State Court at the time this case was removed shall be filed as separate docket entries in the CM/ECF system by the moving party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2012. (LMF)
November 5, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE in opposition re #19 MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] filed by Lennar Corporation, North American Title Company, U.S. Home Corporation. (Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 19 MOTION to substitute party [MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] by Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1: Third Amended and Restated Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF, #2 Exhibit A-2: Continuation of Third Amended and Restated Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF, #3 Exhibit B: Order Confirming Third Amended and Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., in the US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF)(Kegerreis, Sharon) Modified on 6/24/2013 (kma).
November 5, 2012 Filing 18 MOTION to disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of L. Christian Marlin, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marcie R. Getelman, #3 Exhibit C - Copy of Order on Verified Complaint for Emergency Injunctive Relief and Disqualification of Duane Morris, LLP, in McKesson Information Solutions, Inc. v. Duane Morris, LLP, in the Superior Court of Fulton County, State of Georgia, Case No. 2006CV121110)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 17 MOTION to substitute attorney Anthony Strasius and Rachel Kelman of Wilson, Elser, Moskowitz, Edelman & Dicker LLP for Onier Llopiz and Joan Carlos of Lydecker Diaz by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., David Sawyer. (Kegerreis, Sharon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell.
November 5, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for leave to file excess pages [Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporation's Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.] by Lennar Corporation, U.S. Home Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants Lennar Corp. and US Home Corp's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #13 Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #1 Notice of removal, #7 Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other), #11 Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other) [PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VARIOUS FILINGS ON CERTAIN DEFENDANTS] (Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Plaintiff is directed to file the operative complaint in this matter as a separate entry in the CM/ECF system. Any motions that were pending in the State Court at the time this case was removed shall be filed as separate docket entries in the CM/ECF system by the moving party. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2012. (LMF)
November 5, 2012 Filing 13 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL] (Attachments: #1 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 12 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal, #11 Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other)Notice (Other) [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE PENDING DEFENDANTS LENNAR CORP., U.S. HOME CORP., AND NORTH AMERICAN TITLE COMPANYS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE NEIL F. LURIA, PLAN TRUSTEE, AS PLAINTIFF IN THIS PROCEEDING IN PLACE OF TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP.] (Attachments: #1 Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 11 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE PENDING] (Attachments: #1 Motion to Substitute Neil F. Luria, Plan Trustee, as Plaintiff in this Proceeding in Place of Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp, #2 Exhibit A-1: Third Amended and Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF, #3 Exhibit A-2: Continuation of Third Amended and Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF, #4 Exhibit B: Order Confirming Third Amended and Restated Joint Plan of Liquidation of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, in re Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al., in the US Bankruptcy Court for the Middle District of Florida, Case No. 3:09-bk-07047-JAF)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 10 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE PENDING DEFENDANTS LENNAR CORPORATION AND U.S. HOME CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF, TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORP. AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW] (Attachments: #1 Defendants Lennar Corporation and U.S. Home Corporations Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration of L. Christian Marlin, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Marcie R. Getelman, #4 Exhibit C - Copy of Order on Verified Complaint for Emergency Injunctive Relief and Disqualification of Duane Morris, LLP, in McKesson Information Solutions, Inc. v. Duane Morris, LLP, in the Superior Court of Fulton County, State of Georgia, Case No. 2006CV121110)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 9 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE PENDING STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS ANTHONY GIZZI REAL ESTATE APPRAISALS, INC., AND DAVID SAWYER] (Attachments: #1 Substitution of Counsel for Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 5, 2012 Filing 8 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING FROM STATE COURT FILE THE PENDING DEFENDANTS LENNAR CORP. AND U.S. HOME CORP.S MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON MOTION TO DISQUALIFY COUNSEL] (Attachments: #1 Defendants Lennar Corp. and U.S. Home Corp.s Motion to Exceed Page Limitation on Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff, Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.)(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 7 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS (VOLUME 5 OF 5)] (Attachments: #1 VOLUME 5 OF 5 of Index to State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 1 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Kelly Hatch and Aspen Home Loans, LLC], #3 Exhibit 2 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC], #4 Exhibit 3 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Peggy Ferguson], #5 Exhibit 4 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Paul Andrew Gulbronson], #6 Exhibit 5 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #7 Exhibit 6 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Julie White], #8 Exhibit 7 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Utah Exchange Group], #9 Exhibit 8 - RETURNED MAIL [sent to Jenifer White], #10 Exhibit 9 - MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT [Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #11 Exhibit 10 - AMENDED COMPLAINT [First Amended Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial], #12 Exhibit 11 - DESIGNATION [Defendant Andrew Sorensens Designation of Electronic Mail Addresses and Request for Designation of Electronic Mail Addresses], #13 Exhibit 12 - NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS [Notice of Designation of Primary and Secondary E-Mail Addresses for Service of Pleadings and Papers, filed by Berger Singerman LLP as counsel for TBW], #14 Exhibit 13 - NOTICE OF HEARING [on September 24, 2012, 1:30 p.m. on Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporations as a Party Plaintiff, filed by Neil Luria as Plan Trustee of the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Plan Trust], #15 Exhibit 14 - STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL [Greenberg Traurig is substituted in place of Wayne Crosby, P.A., as counsel for Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #16 Exhibit 15 - RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #17 Exhibit 16 - SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY [Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Summary of Authority Cited in Its Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend], #18 Exhibit 17 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [of Patrick E. Geraghty of the law firm of Geraghty, Dougherty & Edwards, P.A., as special co-counsel for TBW], #19 Exhibit 18 - NOTICE [Defendant Andrew Sorensens Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Party Plaintiff], #20 Exhibit 19 - NOTICE [Defendant Matthew Devereauxs Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Party Plaintiff], #21 Exhibit 20 - REPLY [Plaintiffs Reply in Further Support of Its Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #22 Exhibit 21 - MINUTES [Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Add FDIC as Additional Party Granted], #23 Exhibit 22 - JOINDER [Defendant Charles M. Burnetts Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #24 Exhibit 23 - JOINDER [Defendant Charles M. Burnetts Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #25 Exhibit 24 - ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL [Greenberg Traurig P.A. is substituted in place of J. Wayne Crosby, P.A.], #26 Exhibit 25 - JOINDER [Defendant Ayla Burnetts Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #27 Exhibit 26 - JOINDER [Defendant Ayla Burnetts Notice of Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Brief in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as a Party Plaintiff], #28 Exhibit 27 - NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS [by Theodore L. Tripp Jr. of the law firm of Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP on behalf of Defendant Matthew Devereaux], #29 Exhibit 28 - ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT [Order Granting Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Complaint to Join the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation as Receiver of Colonial Bank as a Party Plaintiff], #30 Exhibit 29 - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL [Theodore L. Tripp Jr. of the law firm of Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP on behalf of Defendant Matthew Devereaux], #31 Exhibit 30 - MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL OF RECORD [substituting law firm of Berger Singerman in place of Troutman Sanders as counsel for TBW], #32 Exhibit 31 - NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES IN COMPLIANCE WITH E-MAIL SERVICE RULE [filed by counsel for Defendants], #33 Exhibit 32 - ORDER SUBSTITUTING COUNSEL [Agreed Order Granting Motion to Substitute Counsel; Berger Singerman is substituted as counsel in place of Troutman Sanders as counsel for TBW], #34 Exhibit 33 - NOTICE OF FILING [by Plaintiffs of the Notice of Removal filed in the US District Court for the Middle District of Florida])(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS (VOLUME 4 OF 5)] (Attachments: #1 VOLUME 4 OF 5 of Index to to State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 1 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Kelly Hatch], #3 Exhibit 2 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC], #4 Exhibit 3 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Charles M. Burnett], #5 Exhibit 4 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer], #6 Exhibit 5 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Julie White], #7 Exhibit 6 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Ayla D. Burnett], #8 Exhibit 7 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Jenifer White], #9 Exhibit 8 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Aspen Home Loans, LLC], #10 Exhibit 9 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Peggy Ferguson], #11 Exhibit 10 - MOTION TO COMPEL [by TBW against Utah Exchange Group], #12 Exhibit 11 - SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION [to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., issued by TBW], #13 Exhibit 12 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [TBWs Reply to Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer], #14 Exhibit 13 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [Re-Notice of Taking Videotaped Duces Tecum of Nathan Shaw on April 7, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #15 Exhibit 14 - MOTION TO APPOINT [TBWs Motion for Order Appointing Commissioner to Take Testimony of Certain Persons (Freddie Mac) in the State of Virginia], #16 Exhibit 15 - COPY OF MEMORANDUM [by Judge Sherra Winesett], #17 Exhibit 16 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [by Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer for copies of records produced by non-party Wells Fargo Bank], #18 Exhibit 17 - NOTICE OF HEARING [for April 27, 2009, 1:30 p.m. on TBWs Motion for Order Appointing Commissioner to Take Testimony of Certain Persons in the State of Virginia, filed by TBW], #19 Exhibit 18 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [to TBW from Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #20 Exhibit 19 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS [filed by TBW], #21 Exhibit 20 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES [Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Answers to Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories], #22 Exhibit 21 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES [Notice of Service of Plaintiffs Answers to Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.s First Set of Interrogatories], #23 Exhibit 22 - NOTICE OF FILING WITH EXHIBITS ATTACHED [Composite Exhibit 1 to Koch & Trushins Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record], #24 Exhibit 23 - NOTICE OF HEARING (Telephonic) [on Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Records on April 27, 2009, at 8:45 a.m., filed by Defendants Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC], #25 Exhibit 24 - COMMISSION TO TAKE OUT-OF-STATE TESTIMONY [Order and Commission to Take Depositions in the State of Virginia], #26 Exhibit 25 - MINUTES [Circuit Court Minutes Plaintiffs Motion to Appoint Commissioner Granted], #27 Exhibit 26 - MINUTES [Circuit Court Minutes Motion to Withdraw as Counsel Granted], #28 Exhibit 27 - MOTION TO APPOINT [TBWs Motion for Appointment of Special Master], #29 Exhibit 28 - NOTICE OF HEARING [on August 10, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. on TBWs motions to compel against Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., David Sawyer, Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Aspen Home Loans, LLC, Kelly Hatch], #30 Exhibit 29 - NOTICE OF FILING [pluries summons and affidavit of service for Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #31 Exhibit 30 - CA-DR Service Document - Moore, Michael Riley Sr - Pluries Summons (20 day) Issued, #32 Exhibit 31 - ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL [Order Granting Koch & Trushin, P.A.s Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record for Defendants Ayla D. Burnett, Charles M. Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC], #33 Exhibit 32 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT [by Defendant Matthew Devereaux to TBW], #34 Exhibit 33 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [of Records Custodian of Freddie Mac on June 16, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., filed by TBW], #35 Exhibit 34 - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY [Commerce Bank, N.A., filed by TBW], #36 Exhibit 35 - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY [Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed by TBW], #37 Exhibit 36 - WITHDRAWAL [Defendant Matthew Devereauxs Notice of Withdrawal of Proposal for Settlement to Plaintiff], #38 Exhibit 37 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT [Notice of Service of Defendant Matthew Devereauxs Second Proposal for Settlement to Plaintiff], #39 Exhibit 38 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Andrew James Sorensen on July 8, 2009, and July 9, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., filed by TBW], #40 Exhibit 39 - NOTICE OF FILING [pluries summons and affidavit of service for Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #41 Exhibit 40 - CA-DR Service Document - Moore, Michael Riley Sr - Pluries Summons (20 day) Issued, #42 Exhibit 41 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Duces Tecum of Charles Richard Scariano on June 24, 2009, 2:30 p.m. (continuing to June 25, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., filed by TBW], #43 Exhibit 42 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Duces Tecum of Naples Realty Services, Inc., on June 24, 2009, 9:00 p.m., filed by TBW], #44 Exhibit 43 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Duces Tecum of Naples Realty Services, Inc., on June 24, 2009, 9:00 p.m., filed by TBW], #45 Exhibit 44 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Duces Tecum of Charles Richard Scariano on June 24, 2009, 2:30 p.m. (continuing to June 25, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., filed by TBW], #46 Exhibit 45 - MOTION [by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company, for Commission to Request Issuance of Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum to Kasie Snyder and Darrin Snyder in the Marion County, West Virginia Circuit Court], #47 Exhibit 46 - SUBPOENA NOT SERVED [Subpoena Duces Tecum Without Deposition to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., issued by TBW], #48 Exhibit 47 - SUBPOENA SERVED [Subpoena Duces Tecum Without Deposition to Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., issued by TBW], #49 Exhibit 48 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [of Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., Pursuant to Fl. R. Civ. Pro. 1.310(b)(6), filed by TBW], #50 Exhibit 49 - ORDER GRANTING MOTION [Order Granting Motion by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company, for Commission to Request Issuance of Deposition Subpoena Duces Tecum to Kasie Snyder and Darrin Snyder in the Marion County, West Virginia Circuit Court], #51 Exhibit 50 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (NOT ISSUED) [against Defendant Michael Riley Moore Sr., filed TBW], #52 Exhibit 51 - SUBPOENA SERVED [Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition to Naples Realty Services, Inc., filed by TBW], #53 Exhibit 52 - COPY OF MEMORANDUM [issued by Judge Sherra Winesett regarding proposed Order on Motion for Commission to Request Issuance of Depo Subpoena Duces Tecum], #54 Exhibit 53 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ISSUED) [against Defendant Michael Riley Moore Sr., filed TBW], #55 Exhibit 54 - MOTION TO APPOINT [TBWs Motion for Order Appointing Commissioner to Take Testimony of Certain Persons in the State of Utah], #56 Exhibit 55 - COPY OF MEMORANDUM [issued by Judge Sherra Winesett regarding proposed Order on Motion for Commission to Request Issuance of Depo Subpoena Duces Tecum], #57 Exhibit 56 - ORDER [and Commission to Take Depositions in the State of Utah], #58 Exhibit 57 - OBJECTION [Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Objection to Parts 4, 5, and 6 of Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum to Freddie Mac], #59 Exhibit 58 - NOTICE OF HEARING [on July 6, 2009, 8:30 a.m. on Motion for Order Appointing Commissioner to Take Testimony of Certain Persons in the State of Utah, filed by TBW], #60 Exhibit 59 - JOINDER [Defendant Andrew J. Sorensens Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Objection to Parts 4, 5, and 6 of Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum to Freddie Mac], #61 Exhibit 60 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Cheri Galvan on July 15, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #62 Exhibit 61 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Heidi Juretich on July 14, 2009, at 1:00 p.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #63 Exhibit 62 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Jaime McCaffery on July 14, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #64 Exhibit 63 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Randy Craig Norton on July 16, 2009, at 9:30 a.m., filed by TBW], #65 Exhibit 64 - SUBPOENA SERVED [Subpoena Duces Tecum Without Deposition to Commerce Bank, NA], #66 Exhibit 65 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Duces Tecum of Randy Craig Norton on July 16, 2009, 9:30 a.m.], #67 Exhibit 66 - AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING [on August 10, 2009, 2:00 p.m., on i) TBWs motions to compel against Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., David Sawyer, Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC, Charles M. Burnett, Ayla D. Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, Julie White, Jenifer White, Aspen Home Loans, LLC, and Kelly Hatch; ii) Defendant Andrew J. Sorensens Joinder in Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company, Objection to Parts 4, 5, and 6 of Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum to Freddie Mac; and iii) Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company, Objection to Parts 4, 5, and 6 of Plaintiffs Subpoena Duces Tecum to Freddie Mac], #68 Exhibit 67 - MINUTES [Motion to /for Appoint Commissioner & Appoint Special Master Granted], #69 Exhibit 68 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendants Lennar C
November 2, 2012 Filing 5 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS (VOLUME 3 OF 5)] (Attachments: #1 Volume 3 of 5 of Index to Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit 1 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [TBWs Reply to and Motion to Strike the Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Charles Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jenifer White, and Julie White], #3 Exhibit 2 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, Riverwalk Property Ventures, Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Julie White, Jenifer White, and Peggy Ferguson for copies of items produced by Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc.s in response to TBWs Request for Production], #4 Exhibit 3 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by US Home Corp. in response to TBWs Request for Production], #5 Exhibit 4 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by North American Title Company in response to TBWs Request for Production], #6 Exhibit 5 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Lennar Corp. in response to TBWs Request for Production], #7 Exhibit 6 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Andrew James Sorenson in response to TBWs Request for Production], #8 Exhibit 7 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Paul Andrew Gulbronson in response to TBWs Request for Production], #9 Exhibit 8 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Michael Riley Moore Sr. in response to TBWs Request for Production], #10 Exhibit 9 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Matthew Devereaux in response to TBWs Request for Production], #11 Exhibit 10 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Kelly Hatch in response to TBWs Request for Production], #12 Exhibit 11 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [ to TBW by Defendants Utah Exchange Group, et al., for copies of items produced by Aspen Home Loans in response to TBWs Request for Production], #13 Exhibit 12 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Angela Cooley on December 9, 2009, at 9:00 a.m. by Defendants Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Venture LLC], #14 Exhibit 13 - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL [Onier Llopiz, counsel for Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate, Inc., and David Sawyer], #15 Exhibit 14 - NOTICE OF SERVICE [of David Sawyers Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production], #16 Exhibit 15 - NOTICE OF SERVICE [of Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.s Responses to Plaintiffs First Request for Production], #17 Exhibit 16 - ORDER ON MOTION [Order Granting in Part Plaintiffs, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., Motion for Electronic Service], #18 Exhibit 17 - ORDER [Protective Order of Confidentiality], #19 Exhibit 18 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Request for Copies to Plaintiff], #20 Exhibit 19 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ayla Burnett on March 10, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #21 Exhibit 20 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Re-Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Melody Davis on January 22, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #22 Exhibit 21 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Melody Davis on January 22, 2009, at 9:30 a.m.], #23 Exhibit 22 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Steve Zabriskie on January 21, 2009, at 9:30 a.m.], #24 Exhibit 23 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Cancellation of Deposition Duces Tecum of Steve Zabriskie on January 21, 2009, at 9:30 a.m.], #25 Exhibit 24 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [by Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer to TBW], #26 Exhibit 25 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [TBWs Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ayla Burnett on March 10, 2009, and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #27 Exhibit 26 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendant Matthew Deverauxs Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ayla Burnett on March 10, 2009, and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #28 Exhibit 27 - RESPONSE [Plaintiff TBWs Response to Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike], #29 Exhibit 28 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Re-Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum of Steve Zabriskie on February 17, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #30 Exhibit 29 - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Lee Farkas on March 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #31 Exhibit 30 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Notice of Taking Deposition of David Sawyer on February 19, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #32 Exhibit 31 - MINUTES [Circuit Court Minutes regarding i) Motion to Strike and Motion for Judicial Default against Defendant Aspen Home Loans, LC and Brief in Support Thereof (not addressed at this time to be reset); and ii) Defendants, Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss (denied)], #33 Exhibit 32 - AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of David Sawyer on February 18, 2009, 10:00 a.m., filed by TBW], #34 Exhibit 33 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Companys Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of David Sawyer on February 18, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #35 Exhibit 34 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Cross-Notice of Taking Deposition of Steve Zabriskie on February 17, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #36 Exhibit 35 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Ayla Burnett on March 10, 2009, and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #37 Exhibit 36 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Cross-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Lee Farkas on March 13, 2009, at 10:00 a.m.], #38 Exhibit 37 - REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS [Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.s First Request for Admissions to Plaintiff], #39 Exhibit 38 - INTERROGATORIES [Defendant Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.s First Interrogatories to Plaintiff], #40 Exhibit 39 - ORDER ON MOTION [Order Denying Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss and Granting Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Motion to Strike], #41 Exhibit 40 - MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL [of Record the law firm of Koch & Trushin, PA as counsel for Defendants Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Venture LLC], #42 Exhibit 41 - MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY [at Hearing by counsel for Defendants Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Jenifer White, Julie White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Venture LLC], #43 Exhibit 42 - ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONIC HEARING [Ex Parte Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically, hearing scheduled for April 27, 2009, at 8:45 a.m.], #44 Exhibit 43 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [Re-Notice of Taking Videotaped Deposition of Lee Farkas on March 13, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #45 Exhibit 44 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION [of Ayla Burnett previously scheduled for March 10, 2009, and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #46 Exhibit 45 - NOTICE OF SERVICE [of Discovery to Plaintiff, filed by David Sawyer], #47 Exhibit 46 - NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY [Wells Fargo Bank, NA, filed by TBW], #48 Exhibit 47 - REQUEST FOR COPIES [by Defendant Matthew Devereaux for copies of records produced by Wells Fargo Bank], #49 Exhibit 48 - NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION [of Ayla Burnett scheduled for March 10, 2009, and March 11, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., filed by Defendant Matthew Devereaux], #50 Exhibit 49 - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL [of Defendant Matthew Devereaux], #51 Exhibit 50 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [to the Complaint by Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyer], #52 Exhibit 51 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [of Nathan Shaw on April 7, 2009, at 10:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #53 Exhibit 52 - NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION [of Lara Crowley Pearson on April 8, 2009, at 9:00 a.m., filed by Defendants Lennar Corp., U.S. Home Corp., and North American Title Company])(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 4 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS (VOLUME 2 OF 5)] (Attachments: #1 Volume 2 of 5 of Exhibit Index to Notice of Filing State Court Records, #2 Exhibit 1 - STIPULATED ORDER SETTING ASIDE CLERKS DEFAULT [by TBW and Matthew Devereaux], #3 Exhibit 2 - STIPULATION AND ORDER WITHDRAWING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT [by TBW and Matthew Devereaux], #4 Exhibit 3 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by Defendants Lennar Corp. US Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #5 Exhibit 4 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [of Matthew Devereaux], #6 Exhibit 5 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by Defendant Andrew James Sorensen], #7 Exhibit 6 - MOTION TO DISMISS [Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc., and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Motion to Strike], #8 Exhibit 7 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Peggy Ferguson], #9 Exhibit 8 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC], #10 Exhibit 9 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Paul Andrew Gulbronson], #11 Exhibit 10 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Matthew Devereaux], #12 Exhibit 11 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Kelly Hatch], #13 Exhibit 12 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Julie White], #14 Exhibit 13 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal], #15 Exhibit 14 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Jenifer White], #16 Exhibit 15 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Charles M. Burnett], #17 Exhibit 16 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Aspen Home Loans LLC], #18 Exhibit 17 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Ayla D. Burnett], #19 Exhibit 18 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Utah Exchange Group], #20 Exhibit 19 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #21 Exhibit 20 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to Andrew James Sorensen], #22 Exhibit 21 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Requests for Production of Documents to David Sawyer], #23 Exhibit 22 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing alias summons and affidavit of service for Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #24 Exhibit 23 - CA/DR Service Document Moore, Michael Riley, Sr. - Alias Summons (20 day), #25 Exhibit 24 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS ANSWERS TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIES [TBWs Answers to Defendant Lennar Corp.s First Set of Interrogatories], #26 Exhibit 25 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs Objections and Responses to Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Co.s First Request of Production], #27 Exhibit 26 - MOTION TO STRIKE [and Motion for Judicial Default against Defendant Aspen Home Loans LLC and Brief in Support Thereof], #28 Exhibit 27 - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL [by Bradley Trushin, counsel for Defendants Ayla Burnett, Charles Burnett, Jenifer White, Peggy Ferguson, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Venture], #29 Exhibit 28 - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY OF COUNSEL [by Richard Lydecker, Onier Llopiz, and Joan Carlos Wizel, counsel for Defendants Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc., and David Sawyer], #30 Exhibit 29 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by Defendants Ayla Burnett, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Venture, LLC], #31 Exhibit 30 - ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by Defendants Charles Burnett, Peggy Ferguson, Jenifer White and Julie White], #32 Exhibit 31 - NOTICE OF HEARING [by TBW for a February 9, 2009, hearing on i) Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Motion to Strike; and ii) Motion to Strike and Motion for Judicial Default Against Defendant, Aspen Home Loans], #33 Exhibit 32 - NOTICE OF HEARING [by TBW for a February 9, 2009, hearing on i) Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Motion to Strike; and ii) Motion to Strike and Motion for Judicial Default Against Defendant, Aspen Home Loans], #34 Exhibit 33 - NOTICE OF HEARING [by TBW for a February 9, 2009, hearing on Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals and David Sawyers Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint and Motion to Strike], #35 Exhibit 34 - NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM [by Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Company for taking deposition of Angela Cooley on December 9, 2008, at 9:00 am], #36 Exhibit 35 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by TBW to Matthew Devereaux], #37 Exhibit 36 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by TBW to Andrew James Sorensen], #38 Exhibit 37 - REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES [by TBW to Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #39 Exhibit 38 - NOTICE OF HEARING [by TBW for December 1, 2008, hearing TBWs Motion for Electronic Service and Motion for Protective Order], #40 Exhibit 39 - MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER [by TBW for entry of a Protective Order of Confidentiality], #41 Exhibit 40 - MOTION FOR ORDER [TBWs Motion for Electronic Service], #42 Exhibit 41 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendant North American Title Companys Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents], #43 Exhibit 42 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendant Lennar Corp.s Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents], #44 Exhibit 43 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendant US Homes Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents], #45 Exhibit 44 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendant Matthew Devereaux s Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents], #46 Exhibit 45 - RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendant Andrew Sorensens Responses to Plaintiffs First Requests for Production of Documents], #47 Exhibit 46 - MOTION TO STRIKE [TBWs Reply to and Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses of Defendants Ayla Burnett, Utah Exchange Group, and Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC])(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 2, 2012 Filing 3 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. re #1 Notice of removal [PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS (VOLUME 1 OF 5)] (Attachments: #1 Volume 1 of 5 - Exhibit Index to Notice of Filing, #2 Exhibit 1 - DOCKET REPORT for the Taylor, Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp., et al. v. Lennar Corp., et al., in the Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, Case No. 08-CA-021081, #3 Exhibit 2 - COMPLAINT, #4 Exhibit 3 - CIVIL COVER SHEET, #5 Exhibit 4 - MOTION FOR ORDER [Verified Motion for Admission to Attorney Pro Hac Vice by TBW to admit David Dantzler of Troutman Sanders], #6 Exhibit 5 - MOTION FOR ORDER [Verified Motion for Admission to Attorney Pro Hac Vice by TBW to admit Thomas Bosch of Troutman Sanders], #7 Exhibit 6 - CA-DR Service Document - Sawyer, David - Summons (20 day) Issued, #8 Exhibit 7 - CA-DR Service Document - Sorensen, Andrew James - Summons (20 day) Issued, #9 Exhibit 8 - CA-DR Service Document - Gulbronson, Paul Andrew - Summons (20 day) Issued, #10 Exhibit 9 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [by Stearns Weaver Miller, et al., on behalf of Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Company], #11 Exhibit 10 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of original summonses and affidavits of service for Utah Exchange Group, Riverwalk Property Ventures, Charles Burnett, Ayla Burnett, Kelly Hatch, and Peggy Ferguson], #12 Exhibit 11 - CA-DR Service Document - Devereaux, Matthew - Summons (20 day) Issued, #13 Exhibit 12 - CA-DR Service Document - Ferguson, Peggy - Summons (20 day) Issued, #14 Exhibit 13 - CA-DR Service Document - Hatch, Kelly - Summons (20 day) Issued, #15 Exhibit 14 - CA-DR Service Document - Burnett, Ayla D - Summons (20 day) Issued, #16 Exhibit 15 - CA-DR Service Document - Burnett, Charles M - Summons (20 day) Issued, #17 Exhibit 16 - CA-DR Service Document - Utah Exchange Group - Summons (20 day) Issued, #18 Exhibit 17 - CA-DR Service Document - Riverwalk Property Ventures LLC - Summons (20 day) Issued, #19 Exhibit 18 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of original summons and returns of service for Julie White and Jenifer White], #20 Exhibit 19 - CA-DR Service Document - White, Julie - Summons (20 day) Issued, #21 Exhibit 20 - CA-DR Service Document - White, Jenifer - Summons (20 day) Issued, #22 Exhibit 21 - CA-DR Service Document - Lennar Corporation - Summons (20 day) Issued, #23 Exhibit 22 - CA-DR Service Document - US Home Corporation - Summons (20 day) Issued, #24 Exhibit 23 - CA-DR Service Document - North American Title Company - Summons (20 day) Issued, #25 Exhibit 24 - CA-DR Service Document - Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals Inc. - Summons (20 day) Issued, #26 Exhibit 25 - NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES [Lennar Corp.s Notice of Service of First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff TBW], #27 Exhibit 26 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [Defendants Lennar Corp., US Home Corp., and North American Title Co.s First Request for Production], #28 Exhibit 27 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing original summons and affidavit of service for Michael Riley Moore Sr.], #29 Exhibit 28 - CA-DR Service Document - Moore, Michael Riley Sr - Summons (20 day) Issued, #30 Exhibit 29 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing original summons and affidavit of non-service for Aspen Home Loans], #31 Exhibit 30 - CA-DR Service Document - Aspen Home Loan LLC - Summons (20 day) Issued, #32 Exhibit 31 - ANSWER [Response to Summons from Kelly Hatch and Aspen Home Loans], #33 Exhibit 32 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing Response to Summons from Kelly Hatch and Aspen Home Loans], #34 Exhibit 33 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing original summons and affidavit of Jennifer White], #35 Exhibit 34 - CA-DR Service Document - White, Jenifer - Summons (20 day) Issued, #36 Exhibit 35 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ISSUED) [Motion for Default by TBW against David Sawyer and Default against David Sawyer], #37 Exhibit 36 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ISSUED) [Motion for Default by TBW against David Sawyer and Default against Matthew Devereaux], #38 Exhibit 37 - NOTICE OF FILING [by TBW of filing original summons and affidavit for Julie White], #39 Exhibit 38 - CA-DR Service Document - White, Julie - Summons (20 day) Issued, #40 Exhibit 39 - MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ISSUED) [Motion for Default by TBW against Paul Andrew Gulbronson and Default against Paul Andrew Gulbronson], #41 Exhibit 40 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [by Lydecker, Lee, et al., on behalf of Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisals, Inc.], #42 Exhibit 41 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [by David Wallace of Williams Parker, et al., on behalf of Andrew James Sorensen], #43 Exhibit 42 - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE [by Hahn Loeser & Parks on behalf of Matthew Devereaux], #44 Exhibit 43 - AGREED ORDER [setting aside Default entered against Defendant David Sawyer], #45 Exhibit 44 - NOTICE OF FILING [Affidavit of service of initial process on Defendant Aspen Home Loans, filed by TBW], #46 Exhibit 45 - CA-DR Service Document - Aspen Home Loans LLC - Summons (20 day) Issued, #47 Exhibit 46 - AFFIDAVIT [of service of initial process on Defendant Aspen Home Loans], #48 Exhibit 47 - NOTICE OF FILING [Acceptances of Service for Jenifer White and Julie White, filed by TBW], #49 Exhibit 48 - ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS [by Jenifer White], #50 Exhibit 49 - ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS [by Julie White], #51 Exhibit 50 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Request for Production of Documents to Lennar Corp.], #52 Exhibit 51 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Request for Production of Documents to US Home Corp.], #53 Exhibit 52 - REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION [TBWs First Request for Production of Documents to North American Title Company], #54 Exhibit 53 - ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS [by Jenifer White], #55 Exhibit 54 - ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS [by Julie White])(Kegerreis, Sharon)
November 1, 2012 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 12/07/09. (RMT)
October 31, 2012 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twentieth Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, case number 08CA021081 filed in State Court on 08/15/08. filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp. v. Lennar Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer White
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Andrew Gulbronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Riley Moore, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew James Sorensen
Represented By: David A. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Sawyer
Represented By: Anthony P. Strasius
Represented By: Rachel Kelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Home Corporation
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Represented By: Adam Michael Foslid
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Hilarie Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Represented By: Adam Michael Foslid
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Hilarie Bass
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie White
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayla D. Burnett
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenifer Cherrington
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Company
Represented By: Adam Michael Foslid
Represented By: Gregory W. Kehoe
Represented By: Hilarie Bass
Represented By: Timothy Andrew Kolaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Gizzi Real Estate Appraisal, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony P. Strasius
Represented By: Rachel Kelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles M. Burnett
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riverwalk Property Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Devereaux
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Fularczyk
Represented By: Justin B. Mazzara
Represented By: Theodore Lawton Tripp, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy Ferguson
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Home Loans, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Hatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utah Exchange Group
Represented By: Darren Robert Inverso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Thomas B. Bosch
Represented By: Patrick E. Geraghty
Represented By: J. David Danztler, Jr.
Represented By: Edward J. Peterson, III
Represented By: Kelly Ann O'Keefe
Represented By: James D. Gassenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neil F. Luria
Represented By: Patrick E. Geraghty
Represented By: Kelly Ann O'Keefe
Represented By: James D. Gassenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Represented By: Michael H. Delbick
Represented By: Patrick E. Geraghty
Represented By: Orlando Villalba
Represented By: Kelly Ann O'Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Berger Singerman LLP
Represented By: Elizabeth B. Honkonen
Represented By: Victoria Jean Wilson
Represented By: Richard H. Critchlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?