U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Dorian Garcia, DG Wealth Management, Macroquantum Capital LLC and UKUSA Currency Fund LP
Case Number: 2:2015cv00237
Filed: April 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Collier
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0025
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CONSENT ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/16/2015. (LMF)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER re 62 MOTION for order to show cause And Memorandum of Law Why Defendant Garcia Should Not Be Held In Contempt Of Court For Violating The Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/14/2015. (LMF)
June 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting 59 the Unopposed Motion to Reschedule the Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The preliminary pretrial conference will be rescheduled for July 13, 2015 at 2:30 P.M. The Clerk is directed to issue a notice rescheduling hearing accordingly. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/25/2015. (LMF)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting 21 the Plaintiff United States Commodity Futures Trading Commission's ("Commission" or CFTC") Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/29/2015. (LMF)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying 32 Defendants Dorian A. Garcia, DG Wealth Management, Macroquantum Capital LLC, and UKUSA Currency Fund LP's Motion to Stay this Action for 45 Days. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/21/2015. (LMF)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission's Motion for Telephone Status Call on May 12, 2015. Defendants' request to cancel the May 13, 2015 preliminary injunction hearing, as made in Defendants' Respo nse to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 31 , is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction 21 remains set for hearing on May 13, 2015, at 9:30 AM before the undersigned in the United States Courthouse, 2110 First Street, Fort Myers, Florida 33901, in Courtroom 5F. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants must appear in person as telephonic appearances are not permitted. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/12/2015. (LMF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Ashley John Burden
Represented By: Ava M. Gould
Represented By: Susan Padove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dorian Garcia
Represented By: Julie Prag Vianale
Represented By: Kenneth J. Vianale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DG Wealth Management
Represented By: Julie Prag Vianale
Represented By: Kenneth J. Vianale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macroquantum Capital LLC
Represented By: Julie Prag Vianale
Represented By: Kenneth J. Vianale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UKUSA Currency Fund LP
Represented By: Julie Prag Vianale
Represented By: Kenneth J. Vianale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?