Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tamara Lee Wood
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2015cv00437
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Attorney Fees and the Court awards plaintiff's counsel $15,537.75 in attorney's fees pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 406(b) and counsel shall refund the previously awarded amount. The Clerk shall enter an amended judgment awarding $15,537.75 to plaintiff's counsel for attorney's fees with plaintiff's counsel refunding to plaintiff the previous award of $3,458.85. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/17/2018. (RKR)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Attorney Fees. Attorney fees in the amount of $3,458.85 are hereby awarded to plaintiff, and may be paid directly to counsel if the United States Department of Treasury determines that no federal debt is owed. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/26/2017. (RKR)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPINION AND ORDER adopting 24 Report and Recommendations; overruling 25 Objection. The Decision of the Commissioner is reversed and remanded for the purposes set forth in the Opinion and Order. The Clerk enter judgment accordingly and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/15/2016. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Lee Wood
Represented By: Paul James Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Amelia E. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?