Isaac v. Classic Cleaners of Pelican Landing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joann Isaac
Defendant: Classic Cleaners of Pelican Landing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00171
Filed: March 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER granting 18 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs as set forth in the Opinion and Order. The Clerk shall enter an amended judgment granting attorney's fees in favor of plaintiff in the amount of $3,203.50, and statutory costs in the amount of $510.00. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/16/2017. (RKR)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 OPINION AND ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk shall enter default judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant as to Count I as set forth in the Opinion and Order, and close the file. any motion for attorney's fees and/or costs shall be filed within 14 days of the entry of judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/27/2016. (RKR)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion for Clerk's Default. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's Default against Defendant Classic Cleaners of Pelican Landing, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 7/8/2016. (ANW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Isaac v. Classic Cleaners of Pelican Landing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joann Isaac
Represented By: Angeli Murthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Classic Cleaners of Pelican Landing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?