Denoncour v. Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Denoncour
Defendant: Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc. and Joel L. Barrett
Counter_claimant: Joel L. Barrett and Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc.
Counter_defendant: Richard Denoncour
Case Number: 2:2016cv00205
Filed: March 16, 2016
Court: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Charlotte
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Mac R. McCoy
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Settlement; adopting 34 Report and Recommendations; approving Wage and Hour Settlement Agreement. The Clerk shall enter judgment dismissing the case with prejudice, terminate all deadlines and motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/19/2017. (RKR)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending that the 32 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and to Dismiss With Prejudice be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 4/17/2017. (brh)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to dismiss counterclaim and motion to strike Third Affirmative Defense. Defendant Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc.'s counterclaim is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The motion to strike is denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly, and terminate the counterclaim parties only. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/3/2016. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denoncour v. Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Denoncour
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel L. Barrett
Represented By: David K. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Joel L. Barrett
Represented By: David K. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Barrett's of S.W. Florida, Inc.
Represented By: David K. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Richard Denoncour
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?