Gilliam v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: Edward Lee Gilliam
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 2:2016cv00255
Filed: April 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying plaintiff's 84 Motion for Need to Correct Clear Error or Prevent Manifest Injustice. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/13/2019. (CMG)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER denying plaintiff's 82 Motion for the Record and Court Reconsideration. See Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 5/6/2019. (CMG)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION and ORDER denying plaintiff's 78 Motion for Reason why Certain Parts of the Plaintiff's Evidence Ignored. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/18/2019. (CMG)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 OPINION and ORDER granting defendant's 67 motion to dismiss. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment accordingly, terminate all pending motions and deadlines as moot, and close the file. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/27/2019. (CMG)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 68 Joint Motion to Stay the Case Management Order and Memorandum of Law. The Clerk is directed to add a stay flag to the docket. The remaining deadlines in the Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. 50) are stayed pending judicial resolution of the motion to dismiss (Doc. 67) or until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/7/2018. (APH)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Extended Time to Complete Third Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 24, 2018 to file a Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/13/2018. (APH)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 OPINION and ORDER granting defendant's 49 motion to dismiss. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/3/2018. (CMG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 OPINION AND ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint that fixes the pleading deficiencies discussed in this Opinion on or before Wednesday, December 27, 2017. Claims barred by sovereign immunity should not be reasserted. The Court denies without prejudice as moot 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/12/2017. (KP)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying without prejudice 21 Plaintiff's Motion for Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 5/15/2017. (HJ)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER denying 12 Response construed as a motion for reconsideration. The deadline to file an amended motion and affidavit to proceed as an indigent based on a change in financial circumstances or pay the full filing fee is extended through January 27, 2017; and the deadline to file a Second Amended Complaint is extended through February 10, 2017. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/29/2016. (RKR)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER denying 3 Motion to appoint counsel; adopting 9 Report and Recommendations; denying 2 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency and plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $400.00 to th e Clerk within 30 days of this Opinion and Order. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint within 45 days of this Opinion and order that incorporates all allegations and facts within a single document. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/12/2016. (RKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilliam v. U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Lee Gilliam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?