Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. National Park Service et al
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council, Center for Biological Diversity, National Parks Conservation Association, Conservancy of Southwest Florida, Earthworks and South Florida Wildlands Association
Defendant: National Park Service, Sally Jewell, Jonathan B. Jarvis and Stan Austin
Intervenor_defendant: Burnett Oil Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00585
Filed: July 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 114 OPINION AND ORDER denying 36 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying Plaintiffs' 94 Motion for summary judgment; granting Federal Defendants' 100 Motion for summary judgment; granting Defendant-Intervenors' 102 Motion for summary judgment; affirming the National Park Services' Finding of No Significant Impact; denying as moot 106 Motion to Strike; denying as moot 112 Motion for injunction pending appeal. The Clerk shall enter judgment Judgment in favo r of defendants on all counts. Alternatively as to Count VIII, Count VIII is dismissed without prejudice for lack of constitutional standing. The Clerk is further directed to terminate all deadlines and to close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/24/2017. (RKR)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 67 the Unopposed Joint Motion to Set Schedule for Administrative Record. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/16/2016. (HJ)
September 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 17 Burnett Oil Co., Inc.'s Motion to Intervene; granting 22 Barron Collier Company, Ltd., Collier Enterprises Management, Inc., and Collier Resources Company, LLP's Motion to Intervene as a Defendant; denying without prejudice 30 Joint Motion to Set Page Limits and Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Forthcoming Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/28/2016. (HJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Natural Resources Defense Council et al v. National Park Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Alison L Kelly
Represented By: Marcy LaHart
Represented By: Jared J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jaclyn Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Parks Conservation Association
Represented By: Alison L Kelly
Represented By: Marcy LaHart
Represented By: Jared J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservancy of Southwest Florida
Represented By: Alison L Kelly
Represented By: Marcy LaHart
Represented By: Jared J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earthworks
Represented By: Alison L Kelly
Represented By: Marcy LaHart
Represented By: Jared J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Florida Wildlands Association
Represented By: Alison L Kelly
Represented By: Marcy LaHart
Represented By: Jared J. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Park Service
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Joseph T. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sally Jewell
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Joseph T. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan B. Jarvis
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Joseph T. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Austin
Represented By: Mark Arthur Brown
Represented By: Joseph T. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_defendant: Burnett Oil Co., Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Neal McAliley
Represented By: Stephanie S. Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?