Beerman v. Support Dogs, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Judy Beerman and Thomas Beerman
Defendant: Support Dogs, Inc.
Third_party_defendant: Susan Bluehs
Third_party_plaintiff: Support Dogs, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00326
Filed: June 15, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 15, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 35 Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Support Dogs, Inc. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge 35 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to renewing the request after disposition of Third-Party Defendant Susan Bluehs by voluntary dismissal or a default judgment.Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/15/2017. (LMF)
August 10, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default Against Third-Party Defendant Susan Bluehs and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion. The Clerk is directed to enter a Clerk's default against Third Party Defendant Susan Bluehs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/10/2017. (LS)
July 18, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 19 Notice (Other) filed by Thomas Beerman. Plaintiff Thomas Beerman's Notice of Withdrawal of Loss of Consortium Claim 19 is DENIED without prejudice to filing a motion for leave to amend.Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/18/2017. (LMF)
July 11, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 4 Defendant Support Dogs, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/11/2017. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beerman v. Support Dogs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Support Dogs, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Beerman
Represented By: Derrick Gregory Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Beerman
Represented By: Derrick Gregory Isaac
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_defendant: Susan Bluehs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Third_party_plaintiff: Support Dogs, Inc.
Represented By: Alan D. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?