Prunty et al v Morgan & Morgan et al

Plaintiff: Robert R. Prunty
Defendant: Arnold & Itkin LLP, The Meyer Blair Law Firm, Morgan & Morgan LLP, Sheller PC and Kline & Specter, P.C.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00506
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: De Soto
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 62 and 63 Plaintiff Robert J. Prunty's Emergency Motions for Reconsideration under Federal Rules 59 and 60 Due to Fraud Upon the Court and Manifest Error. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/13/2018. (LMF)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 38 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Counts I, III, IV, V, VI, and VII are dismissed without prejudice for lack of personal jurisdiction; denying as moot 39 Defendants' Motion to Dism iss for Failure to State a Claim. Counts II-VII as against Defendant John Bryan Morgan are dismissed with prejudice for failure to state a claim. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment terminate any pending deadlines and remaining motions, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 2/2/2018. (LMF)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 15 Morgan & Morgan Complex Litigation Group, LLC's Motion to Dismiss as Party Defendant. This law firm does not appear to be a named defendant in the Amended Complaint; therefore, dismissal is unnecessary. Defendants' M otion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Doc. 18 ) is DENIED as moot. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 8(a) (Doc. 19 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 13 ) is dismissed without prejudi ce to refiling a Second Amended Complaint on or before December 20, 2017. Failure to file a Second Amended Complaint by this date will result in this matter being closed. Any arguments regarding failure to state a claim are not addressed at this ti me, pending the filing of a Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (Doc. 20 ) is DENIED as moot. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. 26 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/1/2017. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prunty et al v Morgan & Morgan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. Prunty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnold & Itkin LLP
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Meyer Blair Law Firm
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan & Morgan LLP
Represented By: Michael Steven Goetz
Represented By: Marcio William Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheller PC
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kline & Specter, P.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Haberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?