Goines v. Lee Memorial Health System et al

Plaintiff: Donia Goines
Defendant: Lee Memorial Health System and Jeovanni Hechavarria
Counter_claimant: Jeovanni Hechavarria
Counter_defendant: Donia Goines
Case Number: 2:2017cv00656
Filed: November 30, 2017
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2018 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 90 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Defendant Jeovanni Hechavarria's Military Records or in the Alternative Request for Certified Court-Ordered, Signed Subpoena, Duces Tecum, for Production of Said Milit ary Records. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to SHOW CAUSE by December 3, 2018 why they should not be ordered under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37(a)(5)(B) to pay the reasonable expenses, including attorneys' fees, incurred by Mr. Hechavarria and Lee Health in opposing 90 the Motion to Compel Military Records. The Clerk of Court is directed to SEAL Doc. 90-4. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/19/2018. (DRS)
October 10, 2018 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 88 Defendant Lee Health's Emergency Motion to Strike. The Clerk is directed to STRIKE Documents 79, 80, 81, 82, 83, 84, 85, 86 and 87 from the docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/10/2018. (DRS)
October 2, 2018 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 77 Defendant Lee Health's Motion to Extend Time to Comply with Court's Order. Lee Memorial's production of documents pursuant to 76 the Court's September 14, 2018 Order is deemed as timely. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/2/2018. (DRS)
September 14, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Plaintiff's Time-Sensitive Motion for Leave to Take Additional Depositions; granting in part and denying in part 70 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions; denying 75 Plaintiff's Unopposed Time-Sensit ive Motion Seeking Leave to File a Memorandum in Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and Certificate of Good Faith. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/14/2018. (DRS)
August 13, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories; granting in part and denying in part 45 Defendant Lee Memorial Health System's Motion for Protective Order; denying without prejudice 47 Mr. Hechavarria's Affidavit of Indigency, construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 8/13/2018. (DRS)
July 9, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 48 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Disclose Expert Witness Reports; granting in part 50 Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. An amended case management and scheduling order will be issued by separate Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 7/9/2018. (DRS)
May 11, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Motion for Protective Order and denying without prejudice 34 Motion for Leave to Propound Additional Interrogatories to Defendant, Lee Memorial Health System d/b/a Cape Coral Hospital, for failure to comply with the Middle District of Florida Local Rules. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 5/11/2018. (DRS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goines v. Lee Memorial Health System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Memorial Health System
Represented By: Angelique Groza Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeovanni Hechavarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donia Goines
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Fogg
Represented By: David J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Jeovanni Hechavarria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Donia Goines
Represented By: Ryan Andrew Fogg
Represented By: David J. Halberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?