Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Defendant: MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC, Paul S. Doppelt and Deborah A. Doppelt
Counter_claimant: MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC
Counter_defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00021
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Unassigned Judge
Referring Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 9, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 64 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration or to Alter or Amend the Judgment. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 8/9/2018. (BLW)
June 21, 2018 54 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 42 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 51 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant declaring that plaintiff did not owe a duty to defend, terminate all deadlines, and close the file. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 6/21/2018. (BLW)
March 5, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Defendant MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the Duty to Indemnify Issue, or Alternatively, Stay to the extent that Plaintiff's request for a declaration of its indemnity obligations in the underlying state court proceedings are stayed pending further Order of the Court; the Motion is otherwise denied. See Opinion and Order for further details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/5/2018. (BLW)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern-Owners Insurance Company v. MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Bruning Campbell
Represented By: William S. Chambers, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Michael W. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul S. Doppelt
Represented By: Mark C. Anderson
Represented By: Jarred D. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah A. Doppelt
Represented By: Mark C. Anderson
Represented By: Jarred D. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: MAC Contractors of Florida, LLC
Represented By: Molly Ann Chafe Brockmeyer
Represented By: Michael W. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Southern-Owners Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Bruning Campbell
Represented By: William S. Chambers, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?