Brown v. Florida Gulf Coast University Board of Trustees et al

Plaintiff: L Yvonne Brown
Defendant: Florida Gulf Coast University Board of Trustees, Ken Kavanagh, Karl Smesko, Roderick Rolle and Kelly Brock
Case Number: 2:2018cv00157
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: Florida Middle District Court
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: John E. Steele
Referring Judge: Mac R. McCoy
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2018 73 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 51 motion to dismiss without prejudice to filing a Second Amended Complaint within 14 days of this Opinion and Order; denying as moot 18 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. See Opinion and Order for details. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/14/2018. (RKR)
October 23, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 56 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/23/2018. (CMG)
October 19, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiff's 53 Motion for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/19/2018. (CMG)
March 14, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Second Application for temporary restraining order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/14/2018. (RKR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Florida Gulf Coast University Board of Trustees et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: L Yvonne Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Gulf Coast University Board of Trustees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Kavanagh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Smesko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roderick Rolle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Brock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?