Miller et al v. The City of Fort Myers et al

Plaintiff: Deretha Miller, Luetricia Freeman Becker, Ralph Henry and Noemy Rodriguez
Defendant: The City of Fort Myers, Randall P. Henderson, Jr. and Saeed Kazemi
Case Number: 2:2018cv00195
Filed: March 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting in part 54 the Joint Motion to Extend Certain Deadlines in the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including May 7, 2019 to move for class certification. Defendants' response is due June 4, 2019 and Plaintiffs may file a reply brief on or before June 18, 2019. Plaintiffs' expert disclosures are due by May 7, 2019 and Defendants' expert disclosures are due by June 4, 2019. All other deadlines and directives in 38 the Amended Case Management and Scheduling Order remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 3/4/2019. (APH)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 47 Status report filed by The City of Fort Myers, Saeed Kazemi, Randall P. Henderson, Jr. The parties must file a status update on or before December 31, 2018. Defendants must file an answer or renewed response to the Amended Complaint on or before January 15, 2019.Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 12/7/2018. (LMF)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER denying without prejudice 18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The parties must file a status update on settlement on or before December 3, 2018. Defendants must file an answer or renewed response to the Amended Complaint on or before December 17, 2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/24/2018. (LMF)
May 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying as moot 12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/11/2018. (LMF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller et al v. The City of Fort Myers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deretha Miller
Represented By: Ralf Gunars Brookes
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luetricia Freeman Becker
Represented By: Ralf Gunars Brookes
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Henry
Represented By: Ralf Gunars Brookes
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noemy Rodriguez
Represented By: Ralf Gunars Brookes
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Fort Myers
Represented By: Patrick M. Chidnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall P. Henderson, Jr.
Represented By: Patrick M. Chidnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saeed Kazemi
Represented By: Patrick M. Chidnese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?