Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company et al v. Newmar Corporation

Plaintiff: Progressive Select Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company and Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Defendant: Newmar Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00556
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Ft. Myers Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michelle D Hurley, appearing on behalf of Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013039.). (MLS)
October 3, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Kelly B.Micheletti, appearing on behalf of Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013039.). (MLS)
October 3, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference is rescheduled. NEW SCHEDULING DATE AND TIME: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/24/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B of the United States Courthouse and Federal Building in Fort Myers, Florida before the Honorable Carol Mirando, United States Magistrate Judge.(SJB)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion for Continuance of Preliminary Pretrial Conference and to Appear Telephonically. For good cause shown and because the Motion is unopposed, the Preliminary Pretrial Conference scheduled for 10/17/2018 is hereby cancelled. Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference to be set by separate notice. ALL parties must appear telephonically. The toll free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 3535845. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 18556. ALL parties are to appear by landline and not a cellular phone. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed (3) three business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/02/2018. (SJB)
October 1, 2018 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference and to Appear Telephonically by All Plaintiffs. (Stevens, Michael)
September 28, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6B of the United States Courthouse and Federal Building in Fort Myers, Florida before the Honorable Carol Mirando, United States Magistrate Judge. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed (3) three business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration. (SJB)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Unopposed Verified Motion Requesting Admission Pro Hac Vice. Kelly B. Micheletti and Michelle D. Hurley may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/27/2018. (DRS)
September 26, 2018 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Michelle D. Hurley to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Stevens, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
September 26, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Kelly B. Micheletti to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Stevens, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
September 26, 2018 Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Powell, W.)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Joint Motion to Dispense with In Person Meeting Pursuant to M.D. Fla. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(B). The Court will deem the parties' telephonic case management conference proper. The parties are directed to sign and file their Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 9/25/2018. (DRS)
September 24, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for issuance of Dispense with In-Person Meeting by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stevens, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
September 4, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Allied Holding, Inc. for Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company.. (Stevens, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Depositors Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Allied Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Allied Holding, Inc. for Depositors Insurance Company.. (Stevens, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Progressive Select Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate Progressive Direct Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Select Insurance Company.. (Stevens, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Progressive Corporation, Other Affiliate Drive Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company.. (Stevens, Michael)
September 4, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Progressive Select Insurance Company. Related case(s): no (Stevens, Michael)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Newmar Corporation. (Powell, W.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Newmar Corporation. Related case(s): no (Powell, W.)
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Newmar Corporation.(Powell, W.)
August 20, 2018 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/4/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/20/2018. (jmc)
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/4/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/20/2018. (jmc)
August 16, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/16/2018. (MLS)
August 15, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Newmar Corporation filed by Progressive Select Insurance Company, Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company, Depositors Insurance Company, Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company. Originally filed in state court on 7/20/18.(BSN)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 12th Judicial Circuit in and for Lee County, Florida, case number 2018-CA-3406 filed in State Court on 7/20/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number tpa 052471 filed by Newmar Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(BSN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company et al v. Newmar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Represented By: Anne-Marie Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Property & Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Represented By: Anne-Marie Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Depositors Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Represented By: Anne-Marie Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Northwestern Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Bernard Stevens
Represented By: Anne-Marie Dale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newmar Corporation
Represented By: W. Scott Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?