Jones v. Bank of America

Plaintiff: Donald Jones
Defendant: Bank of America and Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00649
Filed: October 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
0 Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
1 Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 30 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #10 Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/28/2018. (APH)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying as moot #25 Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/27/2018. (APH)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying as moot #26 Defendants' Motion for Telephonic Appearance at Hearing. The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for January 9, 2019 is CANCELLED. The parties are not required to submit a Case Management Report until further Order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/20/2018. (APH)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying #14 Plaintiff's Motion, construed as a Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/20/2018. (APH)
November 20, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. (Samsing, Erik) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
November 20, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION to clarify order to proceed in forma pauperis by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RMT)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Defendants Bank of America, N.A. and Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/19/2018. (LMF)
November 19, 2018 Filing 23 SUMMONS issued as to Bank of America. (RMT)
November 19, 2018 Filing 22 SUMMONS issued as to Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. (RMT)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying as moot #18 Plaintiff's Motion to Add Exhibit to His Motion; granting #20 Plaintiff's Motion to Explain the Delay Case Order and Track Two Notice. Plaintiff's Motion #20 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions and Certificate of Interested Persons are deemed timely filed. The Clerk is directed to file Plaintiff's Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Doc. 20-1 at 1) and Certificate of Interested Persons (Doc. 20-1 at 2) as separate docket entries. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/19/2018. (APH)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION to explain the delay case order and track two notice by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RMT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (jmc)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Add exhibit by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RMT)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. (Samsing, Erik)
November 13, 2018 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Ditech Holding Corporation for Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc... (Samsing, Erik)
November 13, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Samsing, Erik)
November 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION answer by Donald Jones. (RMT)
November 13, 2018 Filing 13 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/27/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/13/2018. (RMT)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Erik Tyler Samsing on behalf of Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. (Samsing, Erik)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Recusal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/6/2018. (APH)
November 5, 2018 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bank of America, Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. filed by Donald Jones. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RMT)
October 29, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Recusal by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(RMT)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend #4 Order. The Clerk is directed to amend the docket to reflect that Bank of America and Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc. are two separate Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/25/2018. (APH)
October 22, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend #4 Order on motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Donald Jones. (RMT)
October 9, 2018 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/23/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/9/2018. (jmc)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/23/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/9/2018. (jmc)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #2 Affidavit of Indigency, construed as a Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff may submit an amended complaint on or before November 9, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 10/9/2018. (APH)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/2/2018. (RMT)
October 2, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Donald Jones. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
October 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bank of America filed by Donald Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bank of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reverse Mortgage Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erik Tyler Samsing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?