Molinaro v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ron Molinaro
Defendant: Huahai US Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC and Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00710
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re #22 Joint MOTION to stay (STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE AND DEFER ALL DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTIONS TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS) filed by Huahai US Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. The Parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Case and Defer All Deadlines Pending Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Doc. #22 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the case is stayed for a period of NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order. If the case is not otherwise transferred within this time, the Parties may seek to continue the stay upon expiration of the time period. The parties shall file a status report within seven days of the JPML's ruling on the transfer issue. All deadlines in this case are stayed until further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to add a stay flag to the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/26/2018. (LMF)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #22 Joint MOTION to stay (STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE AND DEFER ALL DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTIONS TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS) filed by Huahai US Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC, Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. The Parties' Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Case and Defer All Deadlines Pending Motion to Transfer Actions to the District of New Jersey for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings (Doc. #22 ) is GRANTED to the extent that the case is stayed for a period of NINETY (90) DAYS from the date of this Order. If the case is not otherwise transferred within this time, the Parties may seek to continue the stay upon expiration of the time period. The parties shall file a status report within seven days of the JPML's ruling on the transfer issue. All deadlines in this case are stayed until further order of the Court. The Clerk is directed to add a stay flag to the case. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/21/2018. (LMF)
November 20, 2018 Filing 22 Joint MOTION to stay (STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY CASE AND DEFER ALL DEADLINES PENDING MOTION TO TRANSFER ACTIONS TO THE DISTRICT OF NEW JERSEY PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1407 FOR COORDINATED OR CONSOLIDATED PRETRIAL PROCEEDINGS) by All Defendants. (Gurland, Harvey)
November 19, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney John R. Davis, appearing on behalf of Ron Molinaro (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013204.) Related document: #14 MOTION for John R. Davis to appear pro hac vice. (RMT)
November 15, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ron Molinaro. Related case(s): Yes (Mussman, Louis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Ron Molinaro. (Mussman, Louis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 19 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. (jmc)
November 15, 2018 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 11/2/18 by Ron Molinaro as to Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Mussman, Louis)
November 15, 2018 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 11/2/18 by Ron Molinaro as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.. (Mussman, Louis)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of John R. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/13/2018. (DRS)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #10 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. Related case(s): Y (Gurland, Harvey)
November 9, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for John R. Davis to appear pro hac vice by Ron Molinaro. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Declaration of John R. Davis, #3 Written Designation and Consent to Act)(Mussman, Louis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
November 9, 2018 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #11 Interested persons order by Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (Gurland, Harvey)
November 9, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Harvey W. Gurland, Jr on behalf of Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC (Gurland, Harvey)
November 5, 2018 Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/19/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/5/2018. (WRW)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/19/2018. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/5/2018. (WRW)
November 1, 2018 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC with Jury Demand. filed by Ron Molinaro.(Mussman, Louis)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #1 Complaint filed by Ron Molinaro. The Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice to filing an Amended Complaint on or before November 7, 2018. Failure to do so will result in the Court closing this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/30/2018. (LMF)
October 29, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ron Molinaro. Related case(s): Yes (Mussman, Louis)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Huahai US Inc. (RMT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC. (RMT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. (RMT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/26/2018. (RMT)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. New case number: 2:18-cv-710-FtM-99CM. (NAS)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Huahai US Inc., Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc., Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-14756494) filed by Ron Molinaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Mussman, Louis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Molinaro v. Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huahai US Inc.
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solco Healthcare U.S., LLC
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prinston Pharmaceutical Inc.
Represented By: Harvey W. Gurland, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Molinaro
Represented By: Louis I. Mussman
Represented By: John R. Davis
Represented By: Allan Kanner
Represented By: Ruben Honik
Represented By: David J. Stanoch
Represented By: Brian T. Ku
Represented By: Layne Hilton
Represented By: Conlee S. Whiteley
Represented By: Michael L. Slack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?