Spigot, Inc. et al v. Hoggatt et al
Plaintiff: Spigot, Inc., Eightpoint Technologies Ltd. and Polarity Technologies Ltd.
Defendant: Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt and Mediavo, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00764
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #24 Order to comply with electronic filing by Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc.. (Peretz, Steven)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER for Joshua Saltz to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 1/10/2019. (SPB)
January 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01, as to Joshua Saltz (signed by deputy clerk). (SPB)
December 26, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Spencer D. Wein and Christopher Healy, appearing on behalf of Eightpoint Technologies Ltd., Polarity Technologies Ltd., Spigot, Inc. (Filing fee $300.00 receipt number FTM013315.) Related document: #19 Unopposed MOTION for SPENCER D. WEIN to appear pro hac vice, #20 Unopposed MOTION for CHRISTOPHER HEALY to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
December 26, 2018 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Cardenas, Maria)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #19 , #20 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Spencer D. Wein and Christopher W. Healy may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/21/2018. (APH)
December 21, 2018 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for CHRISTOPHER HEALY to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Cardenas, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
December 21, 2018 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for SPENCER D. WEIN to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Cardenas, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery and for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including April 17, 2019 to respond to #16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/17/2018. (DRS)
December 14, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Motion for Leave to Conduct Jurisdictional Discovery by All Plaintiffs. (Herrera, Sujey) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Peretz, Steven)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Eightpoint Technologies Ltd., Polarity Technologies Ltd., Spigot, Inc.. (Herrera, Sujey)
November 30, 2018 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc.. (Peretz, Steven)
November 30, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Peretz, Steven)
November 30, 2018 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Leeor Neta, appearing on behalf of Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013227.). (MLS)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Leeor Neta, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/20/2018. (DRS)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Leeor Neta to appear pro hac vice by All Defendants. (Peretz, Steven) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt and Mediavo, Inc. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/4/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/20/2018. (drn)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/3/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/19/2018. (WRW)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/19/2018. (WRW)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendants Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt and Mediavo, Inc. shall have up to and including December 5, 2018 to respond to #5 Plaintiffs' Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/19/2018. (DRS)
November 19, 2018 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/19/2018. (drn)
November 16, 2018 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by All Defendants. (Peretz, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Spigot, Inc., Eightpoint Technologies Ltd., Polarity Technologies Ltd. in State Court on 9/21/18.(drn)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of service by Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt, Mediavo, Inc. Certificate of Service of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal to Adverse Party)(Peretz, Steven)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando. New case number: 2:18-cv764-FtM-29CM. (NAS)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 20th Judicial Circuit, Lee County case number 18CA4601 filed in State Court on 9/21/2018. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-14822813 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peretz, Steven) Modified on 11/19/2018 to edit docket text (drn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spigot, Inc. et al v. Hoggatt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spigot, Inc.
Represented By: Maria Cristina Cardenas
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Spencer D. Wein
Represented By: Christopher W. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eightpoint Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Maria Cristina Cardenas
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Spencer D. Wein
Represented By: Christopher W. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Polarity Technologies Ltd.
Represented By: Maria Cristina Cardenas
Represented By: Sujey Scarlett Herrera
Represented By: Spencer D. Wein
Represented By: Christopher W. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Matthew Hoggatt
Represented By: Steven I. Peretz
Represented By: Joshua Saltz
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediavo, Inc.
Represented By: Steven I. Peretz
Represented By: Joshua Saltz
Represented By: Leeor Neta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?