The Bay Club of Naples, LLC et al v. Acres Capital, LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC and The Bay Club of Naples, LLC
Defendant: Acres Capital, LLC, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, Houston Casualty Company, Tokio Marine Group, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. and Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2018cv00772
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Carol Mirando
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 1/11/2019. (RKR)
January 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC, The Bay Club of Naples, LLC (Woods, Gregory)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Plaintiffs' Motion for Enlargement of Time to Comply with Interested Persons Order for Civil Cases and Order Dated December 20, 2018. For good cause shown, Plaintiffs shall have up to and including January 11, 2019 to file an Amended Complaint and to comply with #3 the Related Case Order and Track Two Notice and #4 the Interested Persons Order for Civil Cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 12/28/2018. (DRS)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to extend time to Comply with Order Dated December 20, 2018 and Interested Persons Order by The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC, The Bay Club of Naples, LLC. (Woods, Gregory) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando.
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Designation of Email Addresses and Notice of Appearance by Gregory N. Woods on behalf of The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC, The Bay Club of Naples, LLC (Woods, Gregory)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER dismissing #1 Complaint for lack of subject matter jurisdiction without prejudice to filing an Amended Complaint within 7 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 12/20/2018. (RKR)
December 12, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC, The Bay Club of Naples, LLC. (drn)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Plaintiffs the Bay Club of Naples, LLC and the Bay Club of Naples II, LLC to retain counsel admitted to practice in this Court and have counsel file a Notice of Appearance with the Court by December 28, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol Mirando on 11/27/2018. (DRS)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 12/10/2018. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/26/2018. (WRW)
November 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 12/10/2018. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 11/26/2018. (WRW)
November 26, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/26/2018. (drn)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Acres Capital, LLC, Houston Casualty Company, Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company, Tokio Marine Group, Inc., Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., U.S. Specialty Insurance Company Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM013209 filed by The Bay Club of Naples, LLC, The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1, #2 Exhibit A-2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bay Club of Naples, LLC et al v. Acres Capital, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bay Club of Naples, II, LLC
Represented By: Harry Zea
Represented By: Gregory N. Woods
Represented By: Rachel Kerlek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bay Club of Naples, LLC
Represented By: Harry Zea
Represented By: Gregory N. Woods
Represented By: Rachel Kerlek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acres Capital, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?