Burgos et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Plaintiff: Cossette Burgos and Alejandro Burgos
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00069
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER directing the Clerk to close the case pursuant to the parties' #17 stipulation. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/14/2019. (RKR)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) by Alejandro Burgos, Cossette Burgos. (Savio, Christian)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER directing Alejandro Burgos, Cossette Burgos to respond to #10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. Responses due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/28/2019. (RKR)
February 25, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Alejandro Burgos, Cossette Burgos. (Savio, Christian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alejandro Burgos, Cossette Burgos. Related case(s): no (Savio, Christian)
February 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Bank of America, N.A.. (Parrino, Marc)
February 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bank of America, N.A.. Related case(s): no (Parrino, Marc)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER taking no further action on #6 Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/14/2019. (RKR)
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Parrino, Marc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Notice of Removal, #6 Order by Bank of America, N.A.. (Parrino, Marc)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/11/2019. (WRW)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/11/2019. (WRW)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing defendant to file a supplement to the Notice of Removal, or show cause, within 7 days why the case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/6/2019. (RKR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/6/2019. (RMT)
February 6, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Bank of America, N.A. with Jury Demand filed by Cossette Burgos, Alejandro Burgos.(RMT)
February 5, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-69-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
February 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Bank of America, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal of Filing Civil Cover Sheet (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parrino, Marc)
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 19-CA-374 filed in State Court on January 21, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15093365 filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parrino, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgos et al v. Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Marc Thomas Parrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cossette Burgos
Represented By: Christian Savio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Burgos
Represented By: Christian Savio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?