Roor International BV et al v. Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Nishi Patel, Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc., Island Mystique, LLC and Sharew S Nisketa
Case Number: 2:2019cv00108
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (kma)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 2/28/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Island Mystique, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/14/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/28/2019. (WRW)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 2/28/2019. (WRW)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Nishi Patel. (MLS)
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc.. (MLS)
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT Corrected against Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc., Nishi Patel filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, #8 Proposed Summons Nishi Patel)(Sasson, Jamie)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/25/2019. (MLS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Sharew S Nisketa. (MLS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Island Mystique, LLC. (MLS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-108-FtM-29UAM. (SJB)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15163080) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nishi Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jai Ambe of Cape Coral, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Island Mystique, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharew S Nisketa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?