Jones v. Barlow et al
Plaintiff: Holley Jones
Defendant: Chris Robles, James Barlow, Andrew Barlow and Christian Robles
Case Number: 2:2019cv00114
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 5/23/19 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (WRW)
April 23, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Designation of Email Appearance by Grant W. Alley on behalf of Andrew Barlow, Chris Robles (Alley, Grant)
April 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Grant W. Alley on behalf of Andrew Barlow, Chris Robles (Alley, Grant)
April 10, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 First MOTION to quash service of process Barlow and Robles filed by Holley Jones. (Radner, Solomon)
April 10, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Andrew Barlow, Christian Robles with Jury Demand. filed by Holley Jones.(Radner, Solomon)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed (3) three business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration.(WRW)
March 27, 2019 Filing 13 First MOTION to quash service of process Barlow and Robles by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit improper service papers)(Culhane, Timothy)
March 26, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service via U.S. Certified Mail by Holley Jones as to Chris Robles. (Radner, Solomon) Modified on 3/27/2019 to edit docket text (drn).
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service via U.S. Certified Mail by Holley Jones as to James Barlow. (Radner, Solomon) Modified on 3/27/2019 to edit docket text (drn).
March 15, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Holley Jones. (Radner, Solomon)
March 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Solomon M. Radner, appearing on behalf of Holley Jones (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013521.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Solomon M. Radner to appear pro hac vice. (drn)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/15/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/1/2019. (WRW)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/1/2019. (WRW)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Solomon M. Radner on Behalf of Plaintiff and Memorandum of Law Pursuant to Local Rule 2.02. Attorney Solomon M. Radner may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 3/1/2019. (APH)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Solomon M. Radner to appear pro hac vice by Holley Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit 2 - Special Admission Attorney Certification)(Budhram, Kristoffer) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 2/26/2019. (drn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to James Barlow. (drn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Chris Robles. (drn)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-114-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Barlow, Chris Robles with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15170851) filed by Holley Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Budhram, Kristoffer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Barlow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Robles
Represented By: Grant W. Alley
Represented By: Timothy Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Barlow
Represented By: Timothy Culhane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Barlow
Represented By: Grant W. Alley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holley Jones
Represented By: Solomon Radner
Represented By: Kristoffer Rajendra Budhram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?