Stalvey et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation

Plaintiff: Deborah Stalvey and Ricky A. Stalvey
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00177
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Remand to State Court and the Clerk is directed to remand the case to Lee County Circuit Court, transmit a certified copy of this Order to the clerk of that court, and to close the case. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/3/2019. (RKR)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Velado, Elizete)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Related case(s): no (Grossman, David)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/9/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/26/2019. (WRW)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/9/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 3/26/2019. (WRW)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/22/2019. (MLS)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-177-FtM-29UAM. (SJB)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Costco Wholesale Corporation with Jury Demand filed by Ricky A. Stalvey, Deborah Stalvey (filed in State Court 2/28/19)(MLS)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 19CA1166 filed in State Court on 2/28/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15267608 filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STATE Court Documents, #2 Exhibit B -STATE Court Complaint #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court Docket Sheet)(Grossman, David) Modified on 3/22/2019 as to docket text(MLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stalvey et al v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: David Wood Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Stalvey
Represented By: Michael M. Noone
Represented By: Elizete D. Velado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky A. Stalvey
Represented By: Michael M. Noone
Represented By: Elizete D. Velado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?