Edison Mortgage Group, Inc. v. Edison Mortgage, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Edison Mortgage Group, Inc.
Defendant: Mark Ary and Edison Mortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00195
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to #18 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff must respond to the motion to dismiss (Doc. #18) no later than 8/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/12/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 11, 2019 Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Edison Mortgage Group, Inc.. (Nieds, Mark)
June 28, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by All Defendants. (Rhodes, Gary)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have up to and including June 28, 2019 in which to file a response to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/24/2019. (brh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1Complaint by Mark Ary, Edison Mortgage, Inc.. (Ryan, Trisha) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 5/24/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
May 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gary Rhodes on behalf of Mark Ary, Edison Mortgage, Inc. (Ryan, Trisha) Modified on 5/24/2019 duplicate entry see #14 (MLS).
May 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Gary Rhodes on behalf of Edison Mortgage, Inc. and Mark Ary (Ryan, Trisha) Modified on 5/24/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #12 motion to dismiss. Mark Ary may file an amended motion on his own behalf within 14 days. Edison Mortgage, Inc. may appear by and through counsel within 30 days of this Order. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/29/2019. (RKR)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss as frivolous re #1 Complaint by Mark Ary, Edison Mortgage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) STRICKEN per #13 Order (MLS)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edison Mortgage Group, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Nieds, Mark)
April 25, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Edison Mortgage Group, Inc.. (Nieds, Mark)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Edison Mortgage Group, Inc. as to Mark E. Ary on 4/1/19.(Nieds, Mark) Modified on 4/25/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF of service by Edison Mortgage Group, Inc as to Edison Mortgage, Inc. on 4/1/19 (Nieds, Mark) Modified on 4/25/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/16/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
March 29, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/29/2019. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Mark Ary. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Edison Mortgage, Inc.. (MLS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-195-FtM-99MRM. (NAS)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15293727) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons Edison Mortgage, Inc., #5 Proposed Summons Mark Ary)(Nieds, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edison Mortgage Group, Inc. v. Edison Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ary
Represented By: Gary Rhodes
Represented By: Trisha L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Gary Rhodes
Represented By: Trisha L. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edison Mortgage Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mark A. Nieds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?