Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 2:2019cv00199
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. Plaintiff shall have up to and including August 26, 2019, in which to effectuate service on Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/27/2019. (brh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/6/2019. (brh)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave for Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Legal Authority by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer)(Walker, Rachel)
April 2, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/16/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/16/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/2/2019. (WRW)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/1/2019. (RMT)
March 29, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-199-FtM-99MRM. (NAS)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Walker, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Walker, Rachel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - ACTION FOR DAMAGES FOR PROPERTY RIGHTS INFRINGEMENT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL - INJUNCTIVE RELIEF SOUGHT against John Doe with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15296743) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?