Roor International BV et al v. Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC and Naureen Virani
Case Number: 2:2019cv00214
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-214-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (RMT)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 4/22/2019 - duplicate to #9 (MLS).
April 22, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie) Modified on 4/22/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/23/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/9/2019. (WRW)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/23/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/9/2019. (WRW)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/9/2019. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Naureen Virani. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-214-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15329701) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lotus Vape & Smoke Shop of Naples, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naureen Virani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?