Loumac Distributors-U.S. LBM, LLC v. Luongo, III et al
Plaintiff: Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC
Defendant: Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc., AGW SRQ, INC., All Glass & Windows, LLC and Louis Luongo, III
Case Number: 2:2019cv00220
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #17 Interested persons order by Louis Luongo, III. (Szabo, Douglas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 54 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-220-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #14 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss because Plaintiff has filed an Amended Complaint (Doc. #52). See Malowney v. Fed. Collection Deposit Grp. , 193 F.3d 1342, 1345 n.1 (11th Cir. 1999). Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/2/2019. (BLW)
July 1, 2019 Filing 52 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Asset Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Lou Employment Agreement)(Zwetsch, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 51 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 50 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 49 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 48 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
June 25, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE regarding doc #46, Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically: ALL parties must appear telephonically on July 31, 2019 at 10:30 A.M. The toll free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 1982804. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 19220. ALL parties are to appear by landline and not a cellular phone. (MLJ)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Have Lead Counsel Attend Pretrial Conference Telephonically. ALL parties must appear telephonically on July 31, 2019 at 10:30 AM. The toll free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 19220. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 18716. ALL parties are to appear by landline and not a cellular phone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/24/2019. (CAS)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until July 1, 2019, in which to file an amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/24/2019. (CAS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 44 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Pretrial Conference by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Generotti, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 21, 2019 Filing 43 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
June 21, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 10:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (MLJ)
June 13, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on October 10, 2019 at 9:30 a.m. before Mark A. Hanley. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
June 12, 2019 Filing 40 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until June 21, 2019, in which to file an Amended Verified Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/5/2019. (CAS)
June 5, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 7/18/2019 at 1:45 P.M. To be rescheduled by separate notice.(MLJ)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 the Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Preliminary Injunction Regarding Trade Secrets Directed to Defendant Louis Luongo, III. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/3/2019. (LMF)
May 31, 2019 Filing 36 Joint MOTION for preliminary injunction regarding trade secrets by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The preliminary pretrial conference currently scheduled for July 18, 2019, is hereby cancelled. The preliminary pretrial conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/31/2019. (CAS)
May 31, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 29, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 01:45 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed three (3) business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration.(MLJ)
May 22, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 6/27/2019 at 2:30 p.m. To be rescheduled by separate notice. (MLJ)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ENDORSED ORDER granting #28 Joint Motion to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference. The preliminary pretrial conference will be reset by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/22/2019. (CAS)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants All Glass & Windows, LLC, AGW SRQ, Inc., and Direct Windows & Door Supply, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have until June 3, 2019, in which to respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/22/2019. (CAS)
May 20, 2019 Filing 28 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC identifying Corporate Parent U.S. LBM Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Raymond Building Supply for Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC.. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Interested persons order by AGW SRQ, INC., All Glass & Windows, LLC, Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc.. (Compton, Jennifer)
May 20, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by AGW SRQ, INC., All Glass & Windows, LLC, Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Compton, Jennifer)
May 16, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. Related case(s): no (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference by Telephone. The parties may conduct the case management conference by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 5/14/2019. (CAS)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed three (3) business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration. (MLJ)
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Generotti on behalf of Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Generotti, Stephanie)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct Case Management Conference by Telephone by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC. (Zwetsch, Kevin)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Louis Luongo, III.(Szabo, Douglas) Modified on 5/9/2019 Counsel filed in error(RMT).
May 7, 2019 Filing 17 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/21/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/7/2019. (RMT)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Louis Luongo, III.(Szabo, Douglas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of as Counsel for Defendant Louis Luongo III Appearance by Douglas Bennett Szabo on behalf of Louis Luongo, III (Szabo, Douglas)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Verified Complaint for Injunctive and Other Relief by AGW SRQ, INC., All Glass & Windows, LLC, Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc.. (Compton, Jennifer)
April 24, 2019 Filing 13 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC (Zwetsch, Kevin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 9 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/24/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/10/2019. (WRW)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/24/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/10/2019. (WRW)
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to AGW SRQ, INC. (RMT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to All Glass & Windows, LLC. (RMT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc. (RMT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/9/2019. (RMT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Louis Luongo, III. #1 Main Document) (RMT).
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-220-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Verified against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15333966) filed by LOUMAC DISTRIBUTORS-U.S. LBM, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Zwetsch, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loumac Distributors-U.S. LBM, LLC v. Luongo, III et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Window & Door Supply, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AGW SRQ, INC.
Represented By: Jennifer B. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Glass & Windows, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer B. Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis Luongo, III
Represented By: Douglas Bennett Szabo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loumac Distributors - U.S. LBM, LLC
Represented By: Kevin Douglas Zwetsch
Represented By: Stephanie Generotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?