Roor International BV et al v. Nipa Enterprise, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Ashmaul Hosna and Nipa Enterprise, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00222
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for sanctions Rule 11 by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. (McGuire, Stephen)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc. Defendants' Rule 26 Disclosures (McGuire, Stephen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of compliance with Court Order Dated 6-18-19 by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc. (McGuire, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE of compliance re #25 Order Confirming No Jury Demand by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Palacios, Chezare)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER discharging #24 Order to Show Cause based upon Defendants' Response to Order to Show Cause Dated 6-18-19 (Doc. #27). However, Defendants' counsel is hereby admonished that the filing of a Case Management Report does not relieve any party of the responsibility to appear for a duly noticed Preliminary Pretrial Conference or other hearing before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/25/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 21, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of compliance re #25 Order Regarding Jury Demand by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc. (Toll, Matthew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #24 Order to show cause filed by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. (McGuire, Stephen)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Non-jury Trial Term commencing 12/1/2020 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/18/2019. (MLJ)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER requiring the parties to file a joint notice no later than 6/25/2019 clarifying any jury demand. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/18/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER requiring Defendants and their counsel to show cause on or before 6/28/2019 why counsel failed to appear at the Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 6/18/2019. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/18/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 6/18/2019. (Digital) (MLJ)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Chezare Palacios on behalf of Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. (Palacios, Chezare)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER discharging #18 Order to Show Cause based upon the response filed on 6/13/2019 (Doc. #19) and the Case Management Report filed on 6/14/2019 (Doc. #20). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/14/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 13, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #18 Order to show cause filed by Ashmaul Hosna, Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. (McGuire, Stephen)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to file Case Management Report and to Show Cause as to all parties of record. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/13/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Unopposed Motion to Hold Scheduled Case Management Conference by Telephone. The parties must file the Case Management Report no later than 6/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/10/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
June 10, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 6/10/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc.; Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV.. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 26, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Toll, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. (Toll, Matthew)
April 26, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Nipa Enterprise, Inc..(Toll, Matthew)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/22/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Ashmaul Hosna. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (drn)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/11/2019. (WRW)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/25/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/11/2019. (WRW)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/10/2019. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Nipa Enterprise, Inc.. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Ashmaul Hosna. (drn)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-222-FtM-99MRM. (SJB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15334324) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Nipa Enterprise, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashmaul Hosna
Represented By: Stephen Nichlous McGuire, II
Represented By: Matthew Scott Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nipa Enterprise, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Nichlous McGuire, II
Represented By: Matthew Scott Toll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?