Roor International BV et al v. Orange Wholesale, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Haitham Shriteh and Orange Wholesale, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00224
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Unopposed Motion to Hold Scheduled Case Management Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/28/2019. (brh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Sasson, Jamie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 10, 2019 Filing 20 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Orange Wholesale, LLC, Haitham Shriteh.(Willhoit, Rashida)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Orange Wholesale, LLC, Haitham Shriteh. Related case(s): NO (Willhoit, Rashida)
May 10, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #16 Interested persons order by Orange Wholesale, LLC, Haitham Shriteh. (Willhoit, Rashida)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Complaint. The response shall be filed no later than June 10, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 5/8/2019. (ATC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 16 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Orange Wholesale, LLC and Haitham Shriteh. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/22/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 5/8/2019. (drn)
May 8, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Willhoit, Rashida) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
May 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Rashida L. Willhoit on behalf of Orange Wholesale, LLC, Haitham Shriteh (Willhoit, Rashida)
May 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Orange Wholesale, LLC, Haitham Shriteh (Gegan, Edmund)
April 29, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Orange Wholesale, LLC. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 4/18/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Haitham Shriteh. (Sasson, Jamie)
April 15, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/29/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/15/2019. (WRW)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/29/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 4/15/2019. (WRW)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/10/2019. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Orange Wholesale, LLC. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Haitham Shriteh. (drn)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-224-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15334990) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Appendix E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Orange Wholesale, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haitham Shriteh
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Wholesale, LLC
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?