Roor International BV et al v. Rasool Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Shahid Rasool and Rasool Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv00254
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE re 24 Order on Motion to Appear Telephonically: DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587, SECURITY CODE: 19254. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. (jmc)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GOVERNING TELEPHONIC PROCEEDINGS. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/2/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for the Parties' Counsel to Attend Preliminary Pretrial Conference Via Telephone. The Clerk of Court is directed to provide counsel with dial-in information before the telephonic hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/2/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 2, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Shahid Rasool, Rasool Corporation. (Schwartz, Wayne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 8/6/2019 at 10:15 AM is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (jmc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion to Hold Scheduling Case Management Conference by Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/26/2019. (brh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Palacios, Chezare) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
June 14, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Shahid Rasool, Rasool Corporation.(Schwartz, Wayne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related cases order and Track 2 Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Shahid Rasool, Rasool Corporation. Related case(s): no (Schwartz, Wayne) Modified on 6/13/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL HEARING. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 6/12/2019. (jmc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 7/29/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Shahid Rasool, Rasool Corporation. (Schwartz, Wayne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Wayne Howard Schwartz on behalf of Shahid Rasool, Rasool Corporation (Schwartz, Wayne)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re 9 Order no pdf, #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 9 Order no pdf, #8 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. The Court ordered Plaintiffs Roor International BV and Sream, Inc. to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by May 7, 2019. (Doc. #8). The Court also ordered Plaintiffs' counsel to complete a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by that same date. (Doc. #7). But Plaintiffs and their counsel have not done so. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel to show cause, in writing, on or before May 10, 2019, why they have not timely filed the required documents; or, alternatively, file the required documents. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/8/2019. (NMC)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/23/2019. (jmc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/23/2019. (jmc)
April 22, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/22/2019. (MLS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Shahid Rasool. (MLS)
April 22, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Rasool Corporation. (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-254-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15374644) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Rasool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Represented By: Chezare Palacios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shahid Rasool
Represented By: Wayne Howard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rasool Corporation
Represented By: Wayne Howard Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?