Roor International BV et al v. Santa Tobacco, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Santa Tobacco, LLC and Asif Govaria
Case Number: 2:2019cv00255
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice, 9 Order no pdf per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order, 9 Order no pdf by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj, Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV, Sream, Inc... (Sasson, Jamie)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on sua sponte review of the file. The Court ordered Plaintiffs Roor International BV and Sream, Inc. to file a Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by May 7, 2019. (Doc. #8). The Court also ordered Plaintiffs' counsel to complete a Notice of Pendency of Other Actions by that same date. (Doc. #7). But Plaintiffs and their counsel have not done so. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS Plaintiffs and Plaintiffs' counsel to show cause, in writing, on or before May 10, 2019, why they have not timely filed the required documents; or, alternatively, file the required documents. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/8/2019. (NMC)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/7/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/23/2019. (jmc)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/7/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 4/23/2019. (jmc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 4/19/2019. (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Asif Govaria. (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Santa Tobacco, LLC. (MLS)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-255-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15375118) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Santa Tobacco, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santa Tobacco, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asif Govaria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?