Borroto v. Walmart Inc.

Plaintiff: Leonor Lara Borroto
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00356
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (TIME ONLY): The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-356-38NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. Any motion or other filing pertaining to the Preliminary Pretrial Conference must be filed three (3) business days in advance of the hearing to ensure consideration.(MLJ)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Allen, Madison)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 the Motion to Appear Telephonically and Be Excused from In-Person Meeting Requirement Pursuant to Court Order. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, the parties are permitted to conduct their case management report conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/7/2019. (HAP)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Leonor Lara Borroto. (Haskins, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Leonor Lara Borroto. Related case(s): YES (Haskins, Stephen)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Leonor Lara Borroto. (Haskins, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 6, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Walmart Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent Walmart Stores East, Inc., Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Investment, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Stores East, L.P. for Walmart Inc... (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Walmart Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Sharkey Ross, Amanda)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/3/2019. (MLS)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/17/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/3/2019. (jmc) (jmc).
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/3/2019. (jmc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #5 Complaint by Walmart Inc. (filed in STATE Court 3/22/19).(MLS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Leonor Lara Borroto (filed in STATE Court 2/28/19).(MLS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-356-FtM-38UAM. (SJB)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lee County Circuit Court, case number 19-CA-1138 filed in State Court on 02/28/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15522831 filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #3 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #4 Exhibit State Court Pleadings, #5 Exhibit State Court Ans to ROGS, #6 Exhibit State Court Ans. to RFA, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sharkey Ross, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Borroto v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonor Lara Borroto
Represented By: Stephen H. Haskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Amanda J. Sharkey Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?