Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc. v. EV Rider

Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc.
Defendant: EV Rider LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00371
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc.. (Harrell, Yvette)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/20/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/6/2019. (MLJ)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/6/2019. (MLJ)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 Patent (initial) Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (drn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/5/2019. (drn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to EV Rider LLC. (drn)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-371-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendant with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15542258) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit A)(Harrell, Yvette) Modified on 6/5/2019 to edit docket text (drn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc. v. EV Rider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Battery Conservation Innovations, Inc.
Represented By: Jay B. Johnson
Represented By: Yvette J. Harrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EV Rider LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?