Elisma v. Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Viergelie Elisma
Defendant: Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC and Harbor Venice Management, LLC.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00389
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 05:7703
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #13 Amended Complaint by Harbor Venice Management, LLC..(Brannon, Paul)
July 26, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 8/13/2019 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (WRW)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and for Telephonic Meeting. The parties must file a joint Case Management Report no later than 8/12/2019. The Court permits the parties to confer telephonically for the purpose of preparing the Case Management Report. In light of the adjusted deadline for filing the Case Management Report, the Court directs the Clerk of Court to reschedule the Preliminary Pretrial Conference from 8/13/2019 at 11:00 AM (see Doc. 9) to 8/20/2019 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/26/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 26, 2019 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to extend time to Prepare Case Management Report and for Telephonic Meeting by Harbor Venice Management, LLC.. (Brannon, Paul) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 15, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order, #8 Interested persons order by Viergelie Elisma. (Jean-Francois, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Viergelie Elisma with Jury Demand. filed by Viergelie Elisma. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by Viergelie Elisma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rights to Sue)(Jean-Francois, James)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Unopposed Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint by Interlineation. The Motion is granted to the extent that within 7 business days, Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint properly naming the defendant in this action. In all other respects, the Unopposed Motion is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/5/2019. (brh)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Viergelie Elisma. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jean-Francois, James)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order, #8 Interested persons order by Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC. (Brannon, Paul)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 7/29/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/1/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (RMT)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/1/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (jmc)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/1/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 6/17/2019. (jmc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul David Brannon on behalf of Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC (Brannon, Paul)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/12/2019. (RMT)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC. (RMT)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-389-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Viergelie Elisma with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15565732) filed by Viergelie Elisma. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dismissal and Notice of Rights, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Summons)(Jean-Francois, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elisma v. Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viergelie Elisma
Represented By: James Gerald Jean-Francois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Retirement Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Venice Management, LLC.
Represented By: Paul David Brannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?