Ahearn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Joseph Ahearn
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Interested Party: SSA
Case Number: 2:2019cv00397
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 12 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 2:19-cv-397-FtM-60NPM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (MLJ)
July 12, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Samuel Fishman, appearing on behalf of James Joseph Ahearn (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013878.) Related document: #9 MOTION for Samuel Fishman to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-397-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (MLS)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 the Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Samuel Fishman of the law firm Samuel Fishman, LLC is permitted to appear specially on behalf of Plaintiff James Joseph Ahearn. Unless already completed, within 14 days from the date of this Order, Mr. Fishman shall send to the Clerk's Office, the application for special admission to practice along with the required application fee. Within 14 days from the date of this Order, Mr. Fishman shall register for CM/ECF. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/5/2019. (HAP)
July 3, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Samuel Fishman to appear pro hac vice by James Joseph Ahearn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Designation of Local Counsel, #3 Special Attorney Certification, #4 Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Certificate of Service)(Berger, Erik) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Joseph Ahearn. Related case(s): No (Berger, Erik)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Plaintiff's Affidavit of Indigency. The Clerk is directed to file all pleadings in this cause without prepayment of costs, and the United States Marshal, upon receipt of appropriate instructions in proper form from the Plaintiff, is directed to effect service of process without prepayment of costs or fees. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this Order to prepare and forward the completed service forms to the Clerk for service by the United States Marshal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 6/26/2019. (CAS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/1/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/17/2019. (jmc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 6/12/2019. (MLS)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway on 7/23/10. (MLS)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-397-FtM-99UAM. Motion(s) REFERRED: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. (SJB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Joseph Ahearn. (Berger, Erik)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by James Joseph Ahearn. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berger, Erik)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahearn v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Joseph Ahearn
Represented By: Erik William Berger
Represented By: Samuel Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?