Blackman v. The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC
Plaintiff: Jamie Blackman
Defendant: The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00448
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell, Trial term commencing 10/5/2020 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/23/2019. (WRW)
August 22, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/22/2019. (DIGITAL) (WRW)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 the Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Consent of Local, construed as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/22/2019. (HAP)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 the Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice and Consent of Local, construed as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/22/2019. (HAP)
August 22, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for John E. B. Gerth to appear pro hac vice by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Admissions List, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Molloy, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 22, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Loren M. Lancaster to appear pro hac vice by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Admissions List, #2 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing)(Molloy, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION for Loren M. Lancaster to appear pro hac vice by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 8/22/2019 (duplicate entry - see Document #23) (MLJ).
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference. A party may appear telephonically or in person on August 22, 2019 at 1:30 PM. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-888-684-8852. The access code is 9847111. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 19448. Parties appearing by telephone are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/21/2019. (HAP)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at Preliminary Pretrial Conference by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Joint Motion to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically. For good cause shown and because the motion is filed jointly, the parties are permitted to conduct their Case Management Conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 8/5/2019. (HAP)
August 2, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for Case Management Conference by Jamie Blackman. (Rothman, Bradley) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
August 2, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Rothman, Bradley)
July 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B is now being heard before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (WRW)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. New case number: 2:19-cv-448-FtM-38NPM. Judge Unassigned Judge no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. Related case(s): y (Molloy, Catherine)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Molloy, Catherine)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Jamie Blackman. (Rothman, Bradley)
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Jamie Blackman. Related case(s): Yes (Rothman, Bradley)
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-448-FtM-99NPM. Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate no longer assigned to the case. (LMF)
July 5, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and affirmative defenses with Jury Demand to #3 Complaint by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC.(Holden, West) Modified on 7/5/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 6 B before Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier. (WRW)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/16/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/2/2019. (WRW)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/16/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/2/2019. (WRW)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall have until July 5, 2019, in which to respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas N. Frazier on 7/1/2019. (CAS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #3 Complaint by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (filed in State Court 6/21/19). (MLS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate.
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC with Jury Demand filed by Jamie Blackman (filed in State Court 5/22/19).(MLS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Unassigned Judge and Magistrate Judge Unassigned Magistrate. New case number: 2:19-cv-448-FtM-99UAM. (SJB)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court in and for Lee County, Florida, case number 19-CA-3213 filed in State Court on 05/22/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15632892 filed by The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet State Court, #4 Affidavit Declaration of Kathleen Dillon, #5 State Court Other Documents), #6 Civil Cover Sheet (Molloy, Catherine) Modified on 7/1/2019 as to docket text(MLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackman v. The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Blackman
Represented By: Bradley Paul Rothman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pavilion At Healthpark, LLC
Represented By: Catherine H. Molloy
Represented By: West Allan Holden
Represented By: John E.B. Gerth
Represented By: Loren M. Lancaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?