Wesolek v. Wesolek et al
Plaintiff: Dana A Wesolek
Defendant: Lauren Wesolek and Bryan J Wesolek
Case Number: 2:2019cv00463
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Dana A Wesolek. (Macey, Eric)
August 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dana A Wesolek. Related case(s): Yes (Macey, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of compliance re #6 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice of Eric N. Macey on behalf of Plaintiff by Dana A Wesolek. (Macey, Eric)
August 23, 2019 Filing 12 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER as to Lauren Wesolek and Bryan J. Wesolek. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/6/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/23/2019. (drn)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 9/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/22/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint filed July 3, 2019 by All Defendants. (Coleman, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel Eric N. Macey of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
July 23, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Eric N. Macey, appearing on behalf of Dana A Wesolek (Filing fee $150 receipt number FtM013915.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Eric N. Macey to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/24/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/10/2019. (jmc)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/24/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 7/10/2019. (jmc)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Special Admission (Pro Hac Vice) of Eric N. Macey, Esq., Designation of Local Counsel, and Consent to Act as Local Counsel. The Clerk is directed to add Eric N. Macey to the service list. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Attorney Eric N. Macey shall send the required fee to the Clerk's Office. Unless already completed, within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Counsel shall complete and submit the E-Filer Registration Form for CM/ECF. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 7/8/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Eric N. Macey to appear pro hac vice by Dana A Wesolek. (Vasquez, Eric) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/5/2019. (MLS)
July 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Bryan J Wesolek, Lauren Wesolek. (MLS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge John E. Steele and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-463-FtM-29MRM. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dana A Wesolek (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15650983) filed by Dana A Wesolek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A 1, #2 Exhibit A 2, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #6 Proposed Summons Bryan, #7 Proposed Summons Lauren, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Vasquez, Eric) ( Modified on 7/8/2019 - cover sheet)(MLS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesolek v. Wesolek et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren Wesolek
Represented By: Thomas G. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan J Wesolek
Represented By: Thomas G. Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana A Wesolek
Represented By: Eric John Vasquez
Represented By: Eric N. Macey
Represented By: James D. Dati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?