Clerk of the Circuit Court v United States Securities and Exchange et al
Plaintiff: Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida
Defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission and The M.B.W. Building, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00515
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 9/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy, per 26 Order. (MLJ)
September 6, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida Notice of Cancellation of Preliminary Pretrial Conference (Walker, Travis)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Counsel of Record, which the Court construes as a motion for leave to allow Scott Harlowe to withdraw as counsel of record for Plaintiff. Attorney Scott Harlowe has no further responsibility for this case. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Scott Harlowe as counsel of record for Plaintiff in this case and to remove him from the electronic list in CM/ECF for this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/6/2019. (NM)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #22 the Motion to Participate in the Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Telephone. In light of the Stipulation and Order for Entry of Judgment in Interpleader and Dismissal, filed on 9/6/2019 (Doc. #25), the Court directs the Clerk of Court to enter a separate notice cancelling the Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019. Because the hearing is cancelled, no appearance by counsel is required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/6/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and Order for Entry of Judgment in Interpleader and Dismissal by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Roessner, Michael) Modified on 9/6/2019 as to docket text and Event Type per lc/nm(MLS).
September 5, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida. (Walker, Travis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for default judgment against The M.B.W. Building, Inc. by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida. (Walker, Travis)
September 5, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Roessner, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to The M.B.W. Building, Inc. (RMT)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Plaintiff's Request for Clerk's Default Against Defendant, The M.B.W. Building, Inc. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a Clerk's Default as to Defendant The M.B.W. Building, Inc. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff must file a motion for default judgment as to Defendant The M.B.W. Building, Inc. or, if appropriate under the circumstances of this case, a motion to extend the time in which to do so until after a determination of the merits against the remaining Defendant. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/22/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
August 22, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for default Lack of Filing Answer by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service upon MBW Building, Inc., #2 Exhibit Notice of Service upon MBW Building, Inc., #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Counsel for Plaintiff, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Entry of Default)(Walker, Travis) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
August 21, 2019 Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Roessner, Michael)
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion to Conduct Discovery Meeting by Telephone. The parties are permitted to conduct the case-management meeting by telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/19/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Conduct Discovery Meeting by Telephone by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Roessner, Michael)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 8/14/2019. (jmc)
August 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 9/2/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
August 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida. Related case(s): no (Walker, Travis)
August 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons #7 Interested persons Order and corporate disclosure statement by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida. (Walker, Travis) Modified on 8/9/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE to counsel Scott Harlowe of Local Rule 2.01(d), which states, each attorney must register with the Clerk of the Court and maintain an email address for electronic service by the Clerk. Maintain your e-mail address by logging into CM/ECF or register for a CM/ECF Account at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
August 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE to counsel Scott Harlowe of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Roessner, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related cases order and Track 2 Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Securities and Exchange Commission. Related case(s): YES (Roessner, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/8/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/25/2019. (MLJ)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/8/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/25/2019. (MLJ)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/24/2019. (MLS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Securities and Exchange Commission, The M.B.W. Building, Inc. filed by Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida (filed in State Court 7/3/19). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(MLS)
July 24, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-515-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to re #4 Complaint by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Roessner, Michael)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit, case number 11-2019-CA-002698 filed in State Court on July 3, 2019. filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Roessner, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clerk of the Circuit Court v United States Securities and Exchange et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clerk of the Circuit Court and Comptroller for Collier County, Florida
Represented By: Scott Harlowe
Represented By: Travis Richard Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Michael James Roessner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The M.B.W. Building, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?