Mangel v. Daza
Plaintiff: Ryan Sean Mangel
Defendant: Ani Katiuska Daza and Ani Katiuska Daza Isaza
Case Number: 2:2019cv00525
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss re #1 Complaint by Ani Katiuska Daza. (MLS)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Ryan Sean Mangel as to Ani Katiuska Daza, a/k/a Ani Katiuska Daza Isaza f/k/a Ani Katiuska Daza De Mangal on 8/30/19 (Conlin, Cynthia) Modified on 9/16/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ani Katiuska Daza with Jury Demand. filed by Ryan Sean Mangel.(Conlin, Cynthia)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDERED: The Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff Ryan Sean Mangel may file an amended complaint on or before August 9, 2019. Failure to do so will cause the Court to close this case without further notice. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/2/2019. (AEH)
July 31, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/14/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/31/2019. (MLJ)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 7/31/2019. (MLJ)
July 29, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 7/29/2019. (MLS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Ani Katiuska Daza. (MLS)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-525-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15740348) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Conlin, Cynthia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mangel v. Daza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ani Katiuska Daza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ani Katiuska Daza Isaza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Sean Mangel
Represented By: Cynthia Ariel Conlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?