Prawitz et al v. City of Cape Coral Charter School Authority
Plaintiff: Adam Prawitz and Charity Prawitz
Defendant: CITY OF CAPE CORAL CHARTER SCHOOL AUTHORITY
Case Number: 2:2019cv00552
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 9/17/2019 by Charity Prawitz, Adam Prawitz as to City of Cape Coral Charter School Authority. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Adam Prawitz, Charity Prawitz. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Adam Prawitz, Charity Prawitz. Related case(s): No. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/28/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/14/2019. (WRW)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/28/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/14/2019. (WRW)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/7/2019. (drn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to City of Cape Coral Charter School Authority. (drn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-552-FtM-38NPM. (SJB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Cape Coral Charter School Authority with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15773996) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Yormak, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prawitz et al v. City of Cape Coral Charter School Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF CAPE CORAL CHARTER SCHOOL AUTHORITY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Prawitz
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charity Prawitz
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?