Covarrubias v. Arthrex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ivonne Covarrubias
Defendant: Arthrex, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00553
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth Ricke on behalf of Arthrex, Inc. (Ricke, Mary)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 the Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their Case Management Conference by telephone for the purpose of preparing the Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/24/2019. (JTB).
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Arthrex, Inc.. (Kolb, Kelly) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly H. Kolb on behalf of Arthrex, Inc. (Kolb, Kelly)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Arthrex, Inc.. (Kolb, Kelly)
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8/28/2019 by Ivonne Covarrubias as to Arthrex, Inc.. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Ivonne Covarrubias. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ivonne Covarrubias. Related case(s): No. (Yormak, Benjamin)
August 8, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/22/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/8/2019. (jmc)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/22/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/8/2019. (jmc)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/7/2019. (drn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Arthrex, Inc.. (drn)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-553-FtM-60MRM. (SJB)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Arthrex, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15774004) filed by Ivonne Covarrubias. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Yormak, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Covarrubias v. Arthrex, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthrex, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Ricke
Represented By: Kelly H. Kolb
Represented By: Mary Beth Ricke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ivonne Covarrubias
Represented By: Benjamin H. Yormak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?