Klenk v. National Transportation Safety Board
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Klenk
Defendant: National Transportation Safety Board
Case Number: 2:2019cv00568
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Timothy C. Klenk. Related case(s): n. (MLJ)
August 26, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/9/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/26/2019. (WRW)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/9/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/26/2019. (WRW)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/13/2019. (MLJ)
August 12, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to National Transportation Safety Board. (RMT)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief against National Transportation Safety Board Filing fee $400, receipt number FtM013962 filed by Timothy C. Klenk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3-A, #5 Exhibit 3-B, #6 Exhibit 3-C, #7 Exhibit 3-D, #8 Exhibit 3-E, #9 Exhibit 3-F, #10 Exhibit 4, #11 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klenk v. National Transportation Safety Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy C. Klenk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Transportation Safety Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?