Allegiant Travel Company v. Medical Office Management, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Allegiant Travel Company
Defendant: Jane Does, John Does, Michael G. Barile, Medical Office Management, LLC and ABC Companies
Case Number: 2:2019cv00635
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mac R McCoy
Referring Judge: John E Steele
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 16 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Judgment attached). (MLS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 15 JUDGMENT ( Signed by Deputy Clerk) (MLS)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for entry of final order. The Clerk shall enter judgment adopting this Order, terminate all pending matters, and close the file. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/8/2019. (RKR)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER deeming John Does, Jane Does and ABC Companies dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate these defendants. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 10/8/2019. (RKR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Final Judgment and Permanent Injunction judgment by Allegiant Travel Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Whitelaw, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Allegiant Travel Company of Dismissal of DOE and ABC Defendants without Prejudice (Whitelaw, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/02/2019 by Allegiant Travel Company as to Michael G. Barile. (Whitelaw, Jennifer)
October 4, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 10/02/2019 by Allegiant Travel Company as to Medical Office Management, LLC. (Whitelaw, Jennifer)
September 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allegiant Travel Company. Related case(s): No (Whitelaw, Jennifer)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/26/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/12/2019. (jmc)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/26/2019. Signed by Judge John E. Steele on 9/12/2019. (jmc)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/11/2019. (MLS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Michael G. Barile. (MLS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Medical Office Management, LLC. (MLS)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 Verified COMPLAINT against ABC Companies, Michael G. Barile, Jane Does, John Does, Medical Office Management, LLC Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number FtM014057 filed by Allegiant Travel Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MLS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allegiant Travel Company v. Medical Office Management, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael G. Barile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Office Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allegiant Travel Company
Represented By: Jennifer L. Whitelaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?