Leno v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Mario Leno
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00653
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Acknowledgment - Transferred case has been opened in the Northern District of California as case 3:19-cv-06436, filed on 10/16/19. (laf)
September 23, 2019 Filing 10 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of California MDL case number: 2741 (laf)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mario Leno. Related case(s): yes (Chambers, G.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Mario Leno. (Chambers, G.)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/25/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/11/2019. (jmc)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/25/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/11/2019. (jmc)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 9/10/19, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (drn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/10/2019. (drn)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Monsanto Company. (drn)
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-653-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15889184) filed by Mario Leno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Chambers, G.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leno v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mario Leno
Represented By: G. Katherine Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?