Gillis v. Deutsche Bank et al
Plaintiff: Ronald P. Gillis
Defendant: Deutsche Bank, Charlotte County, The State of Florida, GMAC-RFC, Albertelli Law, USBank, Wells Fargo, Homecomings and Rali
Case Number: 2:2019cv00701
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/23/2019. (RMT)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDERED: Plaintiff Ronald P. Gillis' Motion to Consolidate Cases (Doc. #4) is DENIED. Gillis's Complaint (Doc. #1) is DISMISSED without prejudice. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment, terminate all pending motions and deadlines, and close the file. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/21/2019. (AEH)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Ronald P. Gillis. (drn)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER requiring within 30 days that Plaintiff pay the filing fee or file an affidavit of indigency. The Clerk of Court is directed to send an Affidavit of Indigency to Plaintiff. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 9/30/2019. (brh)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 9/25/2019. (drn)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertelli Law, Charlotte County, Deutsche Bank, GMAC-RFC, Homecomings, Rali, The State of Florida, USBank, Wells Fargo filed by Ronald P. Gillis.(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gillis v. Deutsche Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC-RFC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertelli Law
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USBank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homecomings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald P. Gillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?