Gaughan v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Plaintiff: Rick L Gaughan
Defendant: John Doe, Tractor Supply Company, Jane Doe and XYX Company(ies)
Case Number: 2:2019cv00714
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #20 the Consent Motion for Second Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant may respond to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 on or before December 6, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 11/22/2019. (HAP)
November 22, 2019 Filing 20 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to the Complaint by Tractor Supply Company. (Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Ryan D. Levy, appearing on behalf of Tractor Supply Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014165.) Related document: #13 MOTION for Ryan D. Levy to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
October 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Seth R. Ogden, appearing on behalf of Tractor Supply Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014165.) Related document: #14 MOTION for Seth R. Ogden to appear pro hac vice. (SPB)
October 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney John F. Triggs, appearing on behalf of Tractor Supply Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014165.). (SPB)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan D. Levy; granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Seth R. Ogden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/30/2019. (HAP)
October 29, 2019 Filing 18 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
October 29, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Rick L Gaughan. (Loeffler, Erica)
October 29, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rick L Gaughan. Related case(s): no (Loeffler, Erica)
October 29, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Tractor Supply Company. (Kain, Robert)
October 28, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Seth R. Ogden to appear pro hac vice by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Ryan D. Levy to appear pro hac vice by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) #10 Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan D. Levy and #11 Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Seth R. Ogden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/25/2019. (HAP)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Seth R. Ogden to appear pro hac vice by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Ryan D. Levy to appear pro hac vice by Tractor Supply Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint. For good cause shown and because the motion is unopposed, Defendant may file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint #1 on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 10/23/2019. (HAP)
October 22, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION to extend time to November 22, 2019 to Respond to Complaint by Tractor Supply Company. (Kain, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Local Counsel Appearance by Robert C. Kain, Jr on behalf of Tractor Supply Company (Kain, Robert)
October 15, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/29/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/15/2019. (WRW)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/29/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/15/2019. (WRW)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/1/2019. (MLS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Tractor Supply Company. (MLS)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Thomas P. Barber and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. New case number: 2:19-cv-714-FtM-60NPM. (SJB)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rick L Gaughan with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15977815) filed by Rick L Gaughan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Summons)(Loeffler, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaughan v. Tractor Supply Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick L Gaughan
Represented By: Erica Livingston Loeffler
Represented By: Edward Michael Livingston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tractor Supply Company
Represented By: Seth R. Ogden
Represented By: Robert C. Kain, Jr.
Represented By: Ryan Daniel Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYX Company(ies)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?