Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc. v. Lovell et al
Plaintiff: Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.
Defendant: Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC and Chris Shone Lovell
Case Number: 2:2019cv00726
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1127
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Defendant must file an amended answer and affirmative defenses no later than December 20, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/4/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.. (Trueba, William)
November 27, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend re #14 Answer to Complaint by Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.. (Trueba, William)
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested Persons Order by Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC, Chris Shone Lovell. (Powers, Robson) Modified on 11/8/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
November 8, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC, Chris Shone Lovell.(Powers, Robson)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/5/2019. (jmc)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 12/9/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time in Which to File a Responsive Pleading or Motion. Defendants must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) on or before 11/12/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 11/1/2019. (NM)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Culhane, Timothy) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance Appearance by Robson D.C. Powers on behalf of Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC, Chris Shone Lovell (Culhane, Timothy) Modified on 11/1/2019 as to docket text (drn).
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related cases Order and Track 2 Notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Barron, Darlene) Modified on 10/23/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/23/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/9/2019. (jmc)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/23/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/9/2019. (jmc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MLS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/8/2019. (MLS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC, Chris Shone Lovell. (MLS)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-726-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC, Chris Shone Lovell with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16002455) filed by Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Allied Trademark, #4 Exhibit Cease and Desist 12-5-2016, #5 Exhibit Cease and Desist 6-7-2018, #6 Exhibit Cease and Desist 9-4-2019)(Barron, Darlene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc. v. Lovell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allied Home Inspections Pro, LLC
Represented By: Robson David Charles Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Shone Lovell
Represented By: Robson David Charles Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allied Building Inspection Services, Inc.
Represented By: Roberto Manuel Suarez
Represented By: William R. Trueba, Jr.
Represented By: Darlene Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?