Davis v. Marceno et al
Plaintiff: Tonya Davis
Defendant: Mazir Tibai, Diane E. Cincotti, Carmine Marceno and Samantha Hutto
Case Number: 2:2019cv00750
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #20 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim, #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in support thereof filed by Tonya Davis. (Morgan, Jack) Modified on 12/10/2019 to edit docket text (SLU).
November 27, 2019 Filing 21 PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Tonya Davis. (Morgan, Jack) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified on 12/2/2019 to edit docket text (SLU).
November 25, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Diane E. Cincotti. (Lundy, S.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Samantha Hutto, Carmine Marceno, Mazir Tibai. (Miller, John)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Samantha Hutto, Carmine Marceno, Mazir Tibai. Related case(s): no (Miller, John)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law by Samantha Hutto, Carmine Marceno, Mazir Tibai. (Miller, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 RETURN of service executed on 10/29/19 by Tonya Davis as to Samantha Hutto. (To correct docket entry #12). (SLU)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 10/29/19 by Tonya Davis as to Mazir Tibai. (To correct docket entry #11). (SLU)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 10/29/19 by Tonya Davis as to Carmine Marceno. (To correct docket entry #10). (SLU)
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 11/2/19 by Tonya Davis as to Diane E. Cincotti. (To correct docket entry #9). (SLU)
November 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Tonya Davis (Morgan, Jack)
November 6, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Tonya Davis (Morgan, Jack)
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Tonya Davis (Morgan, Jack)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Tonya Davis (Morgan, Jack)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Tonya Davis. (Morgan, Jack)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tonya Davis. Related case(s): No (Morgan, Jack)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/31/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/17/2019. (SLU)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 10/17/2019. (SLU)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/17/2019. (RMT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Diane E. Cincotti, Samantha Hutto, Carmine Marceno, Mazir Tibai. (RMT)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-750-FtM-38MRM. (SJB)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16035970) filed by Tonya Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Morgan, Jack)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Marceno et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Davis
Represented By: Jack C. Morgan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazir Tibai
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane E. Cincotti
Represented By: S. Renee Lundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmine Marceno
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samantha Hutto
Represented By: John McQueen Miller, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?