Patten v. LaClair et al
Plaintiff: Barrington R Patten
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc. and Jennifer LaClair
Case Number: 2:2019cv00763
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Nicholas P Mizell
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending #2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs be denied and this case be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 12/12/2019. (brh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Barrington R Patten. (drn)
November 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Barrington R Patten. Related case(s): no (drn)
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/8/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/25/2019. (WRW)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/8/2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 10/25/2019. (WRW)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 10/22/2019. (MLS)
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Barrington R Patten. (RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell.
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial Inc., Jennifer LaClair with Jury Demand filed by Barrington R Patten. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(RMT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patten v. LaClair et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer LaClair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barrington R Patten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?