Zelinski et al v. Securian Financial Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Bradley A Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski and George Zelinski
Defendant: Jarvis Financial, Inc., Securian Financial Group, Inc, Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Edie A Jarvis and Securian Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv00804
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sheri Polster Chappell
Referring Judge: Mac R McCoy
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendants Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company, and Securian Life Insurance Company must respond to the Complaint (Doc. #1) no later than 1/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/13/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
December 13, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #6 Interested Persons Order by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc, Securian Life Insurance Company. (Preston, Brett) Modified on 12/13/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
December 13, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to answer or otherwise respond to Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc, Securian Life Insurance Company. (Preston, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
December 11, 2019 Filing 18 PROOF of service as to Edie A Jarvis on 12/3/19 by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski (Pearl, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
December 11, 2019 Filing 17 PROOF of service as to Jarvis Financial, Inc. on 12/3/19 by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski (Pearl, Robert) Modified on 12/11/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion of Defendants Securian Financial Group, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company, and Securian Life Insurance Company for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants must respond to the Complaint no later than 12/23/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/10/2019. (McCoy, Mac)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 12/9/2019. (jmc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING (AS TO TIME ONLY): The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 2/4/2020 at 10:15 PM is rescheduled. New hearing time: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:15 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Hearing rescheduled to fix the original time from PM to AM. (jmc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 10:15 PM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 1/27/2020. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to #1 Complaint by Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc, Securian Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawicki, Theodore) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy.
November 26, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski and Janice Lynn Zelinski as to Minnesota Life Insurance Company on 11/14/19(Pearl, Robert) Modified on 11/26/2019 as to docket text(MLS).
November 26, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski and Janice Lynn Zelinski as to Securian Life Insurance Company on 11/14/19 (Pearl, Robert) Modified on 11/26/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski and Janice Lynn Zelinski as to Securian Financial Group on 11/13/19 (Pearl, Robert) Modified on 11/26/2019 as to docket text (MLS).
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski. Related case(s): yes (Pearl, Robert)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Bradley A Zelinski, George Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski. (Pearl, Robert)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 11/29/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/14/2019. (jmc)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 11/14/2019. (jmc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/7/2019. (MLS)
November 7, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Edie A Jarvis, Jarvis Financial, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc, Securian Life Insurance Company. (MLS)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-804-FTM-38MRM. (LRB)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edie A Jarvis, Jarvis Financial, Inc., Minnesota Life Insurance Company, Securian Financial Group, Inc, Securian Life Insurance Company with Jury Demand filed by Bradley A Zelinski, Janice Lynn Zelinski, George Zelinski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Edie A. Jarvis, #3 Proposed Summons Jarvis Financial Inc., #4 Proposed Summons Minnesota Life Insurance Company, #5 Proposed Summons Securian Financial Group, #6 Proposed Summons Securian Life Insurance Company)(Pearl, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelinski et al v. Securian Financial Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarvis Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securian Financial Group, Inc
Represented By: Brett J. Preston
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett J. Preston
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edie A Jarvis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Securian Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Brett J. Preston
Represented By: Theodore Joseph Sawicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley A Zelinski
Represented By: Robert J. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Lynn Zelinski
Represented By: Robert J. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Zelinski
Represented By: Robert J. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?